Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | IE | | IT | | LI | | LU | | MC | | NL | | PT | | SE | | SK | | TR | | Examination procedure | 06.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | | 13.02.2004 | Search fee paid | | 13.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 13.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | European patent granted | 27.12.2006 | Opposition procedure | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2007 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 12.05.2004 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20040213 | | Event date: | 12.05.2004 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR | | Event date: | 12.05.2004 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Validation States: | AL LT LV MK RO SI | | Event date: | 04.08.2004 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED | | Event date: | 20.10.2004 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7C 07D 239/42 A | | Event date: | 20.10.2004 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7C 07D 239/22 B | | Event date: | 20.10.2004 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7C 07D 239/34 B | | Event date: | 20.10.2004 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7C 07D 239/30 B | | Event date: | 20.10.2004 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7C 07D 239/36 B | | Event date: | 20.10.2004 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7A 61K 31/505 B | | Event date: | 20.10.2004 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7A 61P 9/00 B | | Event date: | 27.10.2004 | | Event description: | SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20040909 | | Event date: | 27.12.2006 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR | | Event date: | 27.12.2006 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Validation States: | AL LT LV MK RO SI | | Event date: | 27.12.2006 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 08.02.2007 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 60217126 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20070208 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 07.02.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 10.04.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | | Event date: | 22.06.2007 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 01.08.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2278032 T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | | Event date: | 30.03.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20070222 | | Event date: | 05.12.2007 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20070928 | | Event date: | 18.05.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HK GR 1064384 HK | Code Expl.: | +STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG | | Event date: | 28.01.2005 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HK DE 1064384 HK | Code Expl.: | REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG | | Event date: | 06.03.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 16.04.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE FG4A E000918 EE | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA | Effective DATE: | 20070227 | | Event date: | 31.07.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Payment DATE: | 20150616 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.07.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Payment DATE: | 20150609 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.07.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Payment DATE: | 20150626 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.07.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Payment DATE: | 20150609 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Payment DATE: | 20150703 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20150709 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 25.04.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR EP 20070400793 GR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE | | Event date: | 29.06.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 13.06.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 15.02.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE MM4A E000918 EE | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BY NOT PAYING THE ANNUAL FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160731 | | Event date: | 10.02.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT MM9D | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT NO LONGER VALID IN THE REPUBLIC OF LITHUANIA | Effective DATE: | 20160712 | | Event date: | 31.03.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160801 | | Event date: | 28.04.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160731 | | Event date: | 28.04.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160712 | | Event date: | 31.05.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160712 | | Event date: | 31.05.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170228 | | Event date: | 13.06.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Event date: | 30.06.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SI KO00 | Code Expl.: | -LAPSE OF PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20170405 | | Event date: | 12.06.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 24.11.2006 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 15.11.2006 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 22.06.2006 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 26.03.2004 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 02.11.2007 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 30.07.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20210611 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.07.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20210610 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.07.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20210624 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.07.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Payment DATE: | 20210615 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.07.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20210611 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.08.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20210616 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.08.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20210716 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.08.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20210617 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.10.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20210712 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.10.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20210625 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.10.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Payment DATE: | 20210607 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.11.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20210616 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.11.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20210715 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.11.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20210712 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.11.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20210803 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.11.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20210712 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.12.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20210706 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 02.11.2007 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Event date: | 30.06.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160712 | | Event date: | 12.07.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 60217126 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | | Event date: | 13.07.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20220711 | | Event date: | 15.07.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 18.07.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK EUP | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT EXPIRED | Expiry DATE: | 20220712 | | Event date: | 03.08.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20220803 | | Event date: | 03.08.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB PE20 | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS | Expiry DATE: | 20220711 | | Event date: | 01.08.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE MK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20220712 | | Event date: | 30.08.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE EUG | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT HAS LAPSED | | Event date: | 15.09.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MK07 349431 AT T | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY | Effective DATE: | 20220712 | | Event date: | 31.08.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE MK9A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED | | Event date: | 31.10.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20220713 | | Event date: | 31.10.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20220711 | | Event date: | 31.10.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20220712 | | Event date: | 31.10.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20220720 | | Event date: | 31.10.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20220712 | | Event date: | 10.08.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK MK4A E 1565 SK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED | Expiry DATE: | 20220712 | |