EP1387662 - ORAL CARE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAWLOR, Thomas Mark 42 Winifred Street, Old Town Swindon, wiltshire SN13 1RS / GB | [2004/16] |
Former [2004/13] | 01 /
LAWLOR, Thomas Mark 456 London Road Ashford, Middlesex TW15 3AD / GB | ||
Former [2004/07] | 01 /
LAWLOR, Thomas, Mark 456 London Road Ashford, Middlesex TW15 3AD / GB | Representative(s) | Wilding, Richard Alan, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Ltd Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Wilding, Richard Alan, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centre Ltd Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2004/07] | Wilding, Richard Alan, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centers Ltd. Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02747833.8 | 14.05.2002 | [2004/07] | WO2002US15269 | Priority number, date | US20010291175P | 15.05.2001 Original published format: US 291175 P | [2004/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02092038 | Date: | 21.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1387662 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1387662 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q11/00, A61K8/19, A23G3/00 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
A23G3/362 (EP,US);
A23G3/346 (EP,US);
A23G4/064 (EP,US);
A23G4/08 (EP,US);
A23G4/20 (EP,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/24 (EP,US);
A61K8/27 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23G3/346, A23G2210/00 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/22, A23V2250/1634, A23V2250/642, A23V2250/242 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/1588, A23V2250/1642, A23V2250/242 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/1614, A23V2250/1642, A23V2250/163 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2004/07] | A61K7/16, A23G3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUNDPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2004/07] | English: | ORAL CARE COMPOSITIONS | [2004/07] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'HYGIENE BUCCALE | [2004/07] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/07] | 21.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2006 | BE | 04.10.2006 | CH | 04.10.2006 | CY | 04.10.2006 | FI | 04.10.2006 | LI | 04.10.2006 | NL | 04.10.2006 | DK | 04.01.2007 | SE | 04.01.2007 | GR | 05.01.2007 | PT | 16.03.2007 | LU | 14.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | [2009/38] |
Former [2008/22] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 04.10.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5000944 (PRENCIPE MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 9 - line 45 * * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 7 * * column 6, line 39 - line 54 * * claims 1-6 *; | [X]WO9414407 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 3, line 6 - line 22 * * page 5, line 19 - page 6, line 12 * * page 7, line 9 - line 30 * * claims 1-9 *; | [X]WO0032159 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-20 * page 2, line 28 - line 34 * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 19 * * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 15 * * page 10, line 27 - line 29 * * example 4 *; | [PX]WO0156399 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [PX] 1-20 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph 4 * * page 10, paragraph 5 ** examples A-K *; | [PX]WO0168046 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [PX] 1-4,6-8,10-20 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 13, paragraph 2 * |