Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03044053 | ![]() | 11.12.2003 | A3 | WO03044053 | 30.05.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03000873 | ![]() | 20.03.2003 | A3 | WO03000873 | 03.01.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US33144701 | 16.11.2001 | US33669301 | 07.12.2001 | US30007101 | 25.06.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8569446 | ![]() | 29.10.2013 | B2 | US2013040900 | 14.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17146208 | 11.07.2008 | US201213649632 | 11.10.2012 | US29489102 | 15.11.2002 | US92031304 | 12.10.2004 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7745572 | ![]() | 29.06.2010 | B2 | US2009286742 | 19.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17146208 | 11.07.2008 | US29489102 | 15.11.2002 | US92031304 | 12.10.2004 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | US48469609 | 15.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8293703 | ![]() | 23.10.2012 | B2 | US2009022743 | 22.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17146208 | 11.07.2008 | US29489102 | 15.11.2002 | US92031304 | 12.10.2004 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7408021 | ![]() | 05.08.2008 | B2 | US2005032704 | 10.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29489102 | 15.11.2002 | US92031304 | 12.10.2004 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140044399 | ![]() | 14.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CA0201757 | 18.11.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20120123573 | ![]() | 08.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | CA0201757 | 18.11.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20050044471 | ![]() | 12.05.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101375026B | ![]() | 17.03.2014 | B1 | KR20110003552 | 12.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | CA0201757 | 18.11.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101005130B | ![]() | 04.01.2011 | B1 | KR20040018481 | 03.03.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201105 | 19.07.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100966232B | ![]() | 25.06.2010 | B1 | KR20040026686 | 31.03.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201106 | 19.07.2002 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5357196B | ![]() | 04.12.2013 | B2 | JP2011135876 | 14.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4717349B | ![]() | 06.07.2011 | B2 | JP2005521383 | 21.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | CA0201757 | 18.11.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005507647 | ![]() | 24.03.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201105 | 19.07.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4587667B | ![]() | 24.11.2010 | B2 | JP2005506061 | 03.03.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201106 | 19.07.2002 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1847550 | ![]() | 09.01.2008 | A3 | EP1847550 | 24.10.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | EP02748516 | 19.07.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1714979 | ![]() | 25.04.2007 | A3 | EP1714979 | 25.10.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP02779063 | 18.11.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1442058 | ![]() | 19.07.2006 | B1 | EP1442058 | 04.08.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CA0201757 | 18.11.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1417228 | ![]() | 14.02.2007 | B1 | EP1417228 | 12.05.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201106 | 19.07.2002 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2453965 | ![]() | 19.01.2016 | C | CA2453965 | 30.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201105 | 19.07.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002342463B | ![]() | 04.09.2008 | B2 | AU2002342463 | 10.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA0201757 | 18.11.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002319050B | ![]() | 11.09.2008 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201106 | 19.07.2002 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002319049B | ![]() | 25.10.2007 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201105 | 19.07.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002312997 | ![]() | 08.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0206879 | 21.06.2002 | US33144701 | 16.11.2001 | US33669301 | 07.12.2001 | US30007101 | 25.06.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1417227 | ![]() | 10.01.2007 | B1 | EP1417227 | 12.05.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201105 | 19.07.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE333467T | 15.08.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0211199 | 26.10.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201105 | 19.07.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0211200 | 27.07.2021 | B8 | BRPI0211200 | 17.03.2020 | B1 | BR0211200 | 28.09.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201106 | 19.07.2002 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0213786 | 25.05.2021 | B8 | BRPI0213786 | 02.01.2019 | B1 | BR0213786 | 09.11.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | CA0201757 | 18.11.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2453967 | 07.01.2014 | C | CA2453967 | 30.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201106 | 19.07.2002 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2467053 | 07.05.2013 | C | CA2467053 | 30.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA0201757 | 18.11.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100432103C | 12.11.2008 | C | CN1714101 | 28.12.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100509846C | 08.07.2009 | C | CN1589279 | 02.03.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1107578T | 13.03.2013 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP02779063 | 18.11.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1108009T | 04.09.2013 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | EP02748517 | 19.07.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60213274T | 31.10.2007 | T2 | DE60213274D1 | 31.08.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CA0201757 | 18.11.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60217507T | 15.11.2007 | T2 | DE60217507D1 | 22.02.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201105 | 19.07.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60218179T | 22.11.2007 | T2 | DE60218179D1 | 29.03.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201106 | 19.07.2002 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1417228T | 04.06.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201106 | 19.07.2002 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1442058T | 04.12.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA006603 | 24.02.2006 | B1 | EA200400205 | 24.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201106 | 19.07.2002 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA007203 | 25.08.2006 | B1 | EA200400632 | 28.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA0201757 | 18.11.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2269775T | 01.04.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL159903 | 17.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201106 | 19.07.2002 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL161591 | 17.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | CA0201757 | 18.11.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04000561 | 17.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201106 | 19.07.2002 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04004489 | 29.11.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | CA0201757 | 18.11.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO335101B | 15.09.2014 | B1 | NO20040221L | 19.03.2004 | L | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33144701 | 16.11.2001 | CA0201105 | 19.07.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO333999B | 11.11.2013 | B1 | NO20040222L | 19.03.2004 | L | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201106 | 19.07.2002 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO332842B | 21.01.2013 | B1 | NO20041844L | 06.07.2004 | L | Priority number | Date | CA0201757 | 18.11.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ531114 | 22.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201106 | 19.07.2002 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ531115 | 24.03.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201105 | 19.07.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ532721 | 31.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | CA0201757 | 18.11.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL207588B | 31.01.2011 | B1 | PL368912 | 04.04.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201106 | 19.07.2002 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL207591B | 31.01.2011 | B1 | PL370891 | 30.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA0201757 | 18.11.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1442058E | 29.12.2006 | E | Priority number | Date | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7192929 | 20.03.2007 | B2 | US2003096756 | 22.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US19806902 | 19.07.2002 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7241738 | 10.07.2007 | B2 | US2003109437 | 12.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | US19807002 | 19.07.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7317077 | 08.01.2008 | B2 | US2003166569 | 04.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29489102 | 15.11.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200401320 | 26.01.2005 | B | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | CA0201106 | 19.07.2002 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200403624 | 28.12.2005 | B | Priority number | Date | CA0201757 | 18.11.2002 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03008444 | ![]() | 20.11.2003 | A3 | WO03008444 | 30.01.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03008443 | ![]() | 27.11.2003 | A3 | WO03008443 | 30.01.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5622885B | ![]() | 12.11.2014 | B2 | JP2013215191 | 24.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011152133 | ![]() | 11.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE353914T | 15.03.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100475843C | 08.04.2009 | C | CN1649895 | 03.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2281528T | 01.10.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2281529T | 01.10.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1417228E | 31.05.2007 | E | Priority number | Date | US30616101 | 19.07.2001 | US30615001 | 19.07.2001 | US33147701 | 16.11.2001 | Type | ![]() | EP1847550 |