EP1430555 - SODIUM ION BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALENCE TECHNOLOGY, INC. 301 Conestoga Way Henderson, NV 89015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Valence Technology, Inc. 301 Conestoga Way Henderson, NV 89015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARKER, Jeremy 10 Home Farm Close, Shipton-Under-Wynchwood Oxfordshire OX7 6EH / GB | 02 /
YAZID, Saidi, M. 301 Conestoga Way Henderson, NV 89015 / US | 03 /
SWOYER, Jeffrey, L. 301 Conestoga Way Henderson, NV 89015 / US | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Beckmann, Claus, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2014/41] |
Former [2014/38] | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/26] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02749518.3 | 04.04.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002US10775 | Priority number, date | US20010283560P | 06.04.2001 Original published format: US 283560 P | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02097907 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1430555 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/58, H01M10/40 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
H01M4/40 (EP,US);
H01M10/38 (KR);
C01B25/455 (EP,US);
H01M10/054 (EP,US);
H01M10/0564 (EP,US);
H01M10/0565 (EP,US);
H01M4/38 (KR);
H01M4/5815 (EP,US);
H01M4/582 (EP,US);
H01M4/5825 (EP,US);
H01M4/587 (EP,US);
H01M2004/021 (EP,US);
H01M2004/028 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0037 (EP,US);
H01M4/583 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NATRIUMIONENBATTERIEN | [2004/26] | English: | SODIUM ION BATTERIES | [2004/26] | French: | BATTERIES A IONS SODIUM | [2004/26] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 22.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 27.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5582623 (CHU MAY-YING [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 6, lines 45-65 *; | [A]US6120941 (LEE HUNG SUI [US], et al) [A] 6-15* column 7, lines 6-15 *; | [XY] - D.A. STEVENS, J.R. DAHN, "High Capacity Anode Materials for Rechargeable Sodium-Ion Batteries", J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (20000401), vol. 147, no. 4, pages 1271 - 1273, XP002254014 [X] 1-5 * abstract * * page 1271, column L, lines 38-45 * * page 1271, column R, lines 11-44 * * page 1272, column R, lines 18-20; table 1 * [Y] 10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.1393348 | [Y] - WEST K ET AL, "SODIUM INSERTION IN VANADIUM OXIDES", SOLID STATE IONICS, NORTH HOLLAND PUB. COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19880901), vol. 28 - 30, no. PART 2, ISSN 0167-2738, pages 1128 - 1131, XP000169396 [Y] 10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-2738(88)90343-8 | [PX] - R. ALCÁNTARA, J.M. JIMÉNEZ, J.L. TIRADO, "Negative Electrodes for Lithium- and Sodium-Ion Batteries Obtained by Heat-Treatment of Petroleum Cokes below 1000 °C", J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (20020108), vol. 149, no. 2, pages A201 - A205, XP002254015 [PX] 1,4,5 * abstract * * page 204, column R, lines 32-48 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.1431963 | [PA] - D.A. STEVENS, J.R. DAHN, "The Mechanisms of Lithium and Sodium Insertion in Carbon Materials", J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (20010626), vol. 148, no. 8, pages A803 - A811, XP002254016 [PA] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.1379565 |