EP1585954 - MAMMALIAN SWEET AND AMINO ACID HETERODIMERIC TASTE RECEPTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | For all designated states The Government of the United States of America as represented by The Secretary of the Department of Health and Human Services National Institutes of Health Office of Technology Transfer 6011 Executive Boulevard Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | For all designated states The Regents of The University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | ||
For all designated states The Government of the United States of America as represented by The Secretary of the Department of Health and Human Services National Institutes of Health Office of Technology Transfer 6011 Executive Boulevard Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US | |||
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | ||
For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by THE SECRETARY, the Department of Health and Human Services National Institutes of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZUKER, Charles, S. 4778 Thurston Place San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
RYBA, Nicholas, J.P. 6405 Crane Terrace Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | 03 /
CHANDRASHEKAR, Jayaram 7536 Charmant Drive, 1127 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 04 /
HOON, Mark, A. 4218 Warner Street Kensington, MD 20895 / US | 05 /
NELSON, Gregory, A. 4852 Cape May San Diego, CA 92107 / US | 06 /
ZHANG, Yifeng 4083-D Miramar Street La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2014/13] |
Former [2005/42] | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02749804.7 | 03.07.2002 | [2005/42] | WO2002US21269 | Priority number, date | US20010302898P | 03.07.2001 Original published format: US 302898 P | US20010927315 | 10.08.2001 Original published format: US 927315 | US20020358925P | 22.02.2002 Original published format: US 358925 P | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03004992 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1585954 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1585954 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/535, G01N33/566, C12N5/00, C12N15/00, C07K14/705, C07K16/00 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
G01N33/5076 (US)
|
Former IPC [2006/51] | G01N33/535, G01N33/566, C12N5/00, C12N15/00, C07K14/00, C07K16/46 | ||
Former IPC [2005/42] | G01N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/42] | Extension states | AL | 30.01.2004 | LT | 30.01.2004 | LV | 30.01.2004 | MK | 30.01.2004 | RO | 30.01.2004 | SI | 30.01.2004 | Title | German: | HETERODIMERE GESCHMACKSREZEPTOREN AUS SÄUGERN FÜR SÜSSE UND FÜR AMINOSÄUREN | [2005/42] | English: | MAMMALIAN SWEET AND AMINO ACID HETERODIMERIC TASTE RECEPTORS | [2005/42] | French: | RECEPTEURS DE GOUT HETERODIMERIQUES DE GOUT SUCRE ET D'ACIDE AMINE, CHEZ LES MAMMIFERES | [2005/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.01.2004 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 01.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11156070.2 / EP2381256 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.03.2014 | BE | 26.03.2014 | CY | 26.03.2014 | CZ | 26.03.2014 | DK | 26.03.2014 | EE | 26.03.2014 | ES | 26.03.2014 | FI | 26.03.2014 | IT | 26.03.2014 | MC | 26.03.2014 | SE | 26.03.2014 | SK | 26.03.2014 | TR | 26.03.2014 | BG | 26.06.2014 | GR | 27.06.2014 | IE | 03.07.2014 | LU | 03.07.2014 | PT | 28.07.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IE | 03.07.2014 | ||
LU | 03.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
IE | 03.07.2014 | ||
LU | 03.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
IE | 03.07.2014 | ||
LU | 03.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 03.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 03.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
SE | 26.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0006593 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0164882 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0166563 (SENOMYX INC [US]) [PX] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0183749 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [E]WO02064631 (SENOMYX INC [US], et al) [E] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [E]WO02086079 (SINAI SCHOOL MEDICINE [US], et al) [E] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1270724 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN [JP], et al) [E] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [E]WO03001876 (SENOMYX INC [US], et al) [E] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [E]WO03025137 (IRM LLC [BM], et al) [E] 1-37* the whole document *; | [DXY] - MONTMAYEUR J-P, "A CANDIDATE TASTE RECEPTOR GENE NEAR A SWEET TASTE LOCUS", NATURE NEUROSCIENCE, NATURE AMERICA, INC, US, (200105), vol. 4, no. 5, ISSN 1097-6256, pages 492 - 498, XP001073542 [DX] 1-37 * the whole document * [Y] 1-37 | [DX] - KITAGAWA M ET AL, "Molecular genetic identification of a candidate receptor gene for sweet taste", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, (20010427), vol. 283, no. 1, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 236 - 242, XP002197055 [DX] 1-37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.2001.4760 | [DX] - MAX MARIANNA ET AL, "Tas1r3, encoding a new candidate taste receptor, is allelic to the sweet responsiveness locus Sac", NATURE GENETICS, NATURE AMERICA, NEW YORK, US, (200105), vol. 28, no. 1, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 58 - 63, XP002197059 [DX] 1-37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/88270 | [DX] - SAINZ E ET AL, "Identification of a novel member of the T1R family of putative taste receptors", JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200105), vol. 77, no. 3, ISSN 0022-3042, pages 896 - 903, XP002197057 [DX] 1-37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1471-4159.2001.00292.x | [PX] - NELSON G ET AL, "Mammalian sweet taste receptors", CELL, CELL PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, NA, US, (20010810), vol. 106, no. 3, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 381 - 390, XP002197058 [PX] 1-37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(01)00451-2 | [X] - HOON M A ET AL, "PUTATIVE MAMMALIAN TASTE RECEPTORS: A CLASS OF TASTE-SPECIFIC GPCRS WITH DISTINCT TOPOGRAPHIC SELECTIVITY", CELL, MIT PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, MA,, US, (19990219), vol. 96, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 541 - 551, XP000922524 [X] 1-37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(00)80658-3 | [PX] - LI XIAODONG ET AL, "Human receptors for sweet and umami taste", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20020402), vol. 99, no. 7, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 4692 - 4696, XP002254830 [PX] 1-37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.072090199 | [A] - LI XIA ET AL, "High-resolution genetic mapping of the saccharin preference locus (Sac) and the putative sweet taste receptor (T1R1) gene (Gpr70) to mouse distal Chromosome 4", MAMMALIAN GENOME, (200101), vol. 12, no. 1, ISSN 0938-8990, pages 13 - 16, XP002439708 [A] 1-37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s003350010236 | [PY] - BACHMANOV A A ET AL, "POSITIONAL CLONING OF THE MOUSE SACCHARIN PREFERENCE (SAC) LOCUS", CHEMICAL SENSES, IRL PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (200109), vol. 26, no. 26, ISSN 0379-864X, pages 925 - 933, XP001073408 [PY] 1-37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/chemse/26.7.925 | International search | [X]WO0006593 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al); | [E]US6955887 (ADLER JON ELLIOT [US], et al) |