EP1412374 - NOVEL PGC-1 ISOFORMS AND USES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANA-FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE, INC. 44 Binney Street Boston, MA 02115 / US | [2004/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPIEGELMAN, Bruce, M. 271 Waban Avenue Waban, MA 02168 / US | 02 /
ADELMANT, Guillaume Apartment No. 2 126 Pembroke Street Boston, MA 02118 / US | 03 /
PUIGSERVER, Pere 427 E. Giddings St. Baltimore, MD 21205 / US | [2004/27] |
Former [2004/18] | 01 /
SPIEGELMAN, Bruce, M. 271 Waban Avenue Waban, MA 02168 / US | ||
02 /
ADELMANT, Guillaume Apartment No. 2 126 Pembroke Street Boston, MA 02118 / US | |||
03 /
PUIGSERVER, Pere 74 St. Paul Street Brookline, MA 02445 / US | Representative(s) | Townsend, Victoria Jayne, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Townsend, Victoria Jayne, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/24] | Townsend, Victoria Jayne, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley, Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/18] | Fry, Alan Valentine, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02749811.2 | 03.07.2002 | [2004/18] | WO2002US21337 | Priority number, date | US20010303468P | 05.07.2001 Original published format: US 303468 P | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03004613 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1412374 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1412374 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N15/63, C07K14/47, C12N5/10, C07K16/18, C12Q1/68, G01N33/50, G01N33/53 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2004/18] | C07H21/04, C12P21/06, C12N1/20, C12N15/00, A61K38/00, C07K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE PGC-1-ISOFORMEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [2004/18] | English: | NOVEL PGC-1 ISOFORMS AND USES THEREFOR | [2004/18] | French: | NOUVEAUX ISOFORMES DE PGC-1 ET APPLICATIONS DE CEUX-CI | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 20.02.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 27.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.2010 | BE | 08.09.2010 | CY | 08.09.2010 | CZ | 08.09.2010 | DK | 08.09.2010 | EE | 08.09.2010 | FI | 08.09.2010 | IT | 08.09.2010 | NL | 08.09.2010 | SE | 08.09.2010 | SK | 08.09.2010 | TR | 08.09.2010 | BG | 08.12.2010 | GR | 09.12.2010 | ES | 19.12.2010 | PT | 10.01.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/42] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.12.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 08.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0032215 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]) [X] 2-8,11-17,20-22 * the whole document * [Y] 10; | [XY]US6166192 (SPIEGELMAN BRUCE M [US], et al) [X] 2-8,11-17,20-22 * column W * [Y] 10; | [X] - "Homo sapiens chromosome 3p clone RP11-1004L19, WORKING DRAFT SEQUENCE, 8 unordered pieces.", EMBL, (20000111), Database accession no. AC020746, URL: EBI, XP002329206 [X] 1 * abstract * | International search | [X]WO9854220 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]); | [X]WO0135096 (MITOKOR [US], et al); | [X] - PUIGSERVER ET AL., "A cold-inducible coactivator of nuclear receptors linked to adaptive thermogenesis", CELL, (19980320), vol. 92, pages 829 - 839, XP002207325 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(00)81410-5 |