29.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] |
13.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] |
23.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
09.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
29.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] |
02.10.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] |
17.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
08.05.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] |
10.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] |
27.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
13.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
06.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] |
06.03.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] |
13.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] |
23.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
30.05.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
18.04.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.04.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.11.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.07.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.09.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
28.09.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
23.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.05.2004 |
Change - inventor |
published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] |
12.03.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] |
12.03.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] |
21.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.02.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.02.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.02.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|