EP1352106 - TANTALUM AND NIOBIUM BILLETS AND METHODS OF PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Global Advanced Metals, USA, Inc. 880 Winter Street Waltham MA 02451 / US | [2012/46] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION Two Seaport Lane, Suite 1300 Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHALUK, Christopher, A. 2306 Cassard Circle Gilbertsville, PA 19525 / US | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02750302.8 | 09.01.2002 | [2003/42] | WO2002US23640 | Priority number, date | US20010261001P | 11.01.2001 Original published format: US 261001 P | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02088412 | Date: | 07.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1352106 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1352106 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/34, C22F1/18 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
C23C14/3414 (EP,US);
C23C14/34 (KR);
C22C27/02 (EP,US);
C22F1/18 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/42] | Title | German: | TANTAL- UND NIOBKNÜPPEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2003/42] | English: | TANTALUM AND NIOBIUM BILLETS AND METHODS OF PRODUCING THE SAME | [2003/42] | French: | BILLETTES DE TANTALE ET DE NIOBIUM ET LEURS PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION | [2003/42] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 21.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 21.11.2012 | CY | 21.11.2012 | DK | 21.11.2012 | FI | 21.11.2012 | IT | 21.11.2012 | NL | 21.11.2012 | SE | 21.11.2012 | TR | 21.11.2012 | IE | 09.01.2013 | LU | 09.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | FR | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | GB | 21.02.2013 | GR | 22.02.2013 | ES | 04.03.2013 | PT | 21.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
IE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
GB | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
IE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
GB | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
IE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
GB | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
IE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 21.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3497402 (DOUGLASS RICHARD W, et al); | [A]US4844746 (HOERMANN MICHAEL [DE], et al); | [A]WO9961670 (ALTA GROUP INC [US], et al); | [A]WO9966100 (JOHNSON MATTHEY ELECT INC [US]); | [DX]WO0031310 (CABOT CORP [US]) [DX] 1-17 * claims 1-43 *; | [PX]WO0196620 (CABOT CORP [US]) [PX] 36-52 * claims 1-26 *; | [X] - G.I.FRIEDMAN, "GRAIN SIZE REFINEMENT IN A TANTALUM INGOT", METALLURGICAL TRANSACTIONS., METALLURGICAL SOCIETY OF AIME. NEW YORK., US, (197101), vol. 2, pages 337 - 341, XP002227180 [X] 1-94 * page 337, column 1, line 1 - page 340, column 2, line 28; table 4 * | [A] - S.R.LAMPMAN ET AL, METALS HANDBOOK, VOL 2, OHIO, US, ASM INTERNATIONAL, (1990), XP002227181 [A] 1-94 * page 565 - page 574 * | by applicant | - G.I. FRIEDMAN, "Grain Size Refinement in a Tantalum Ingot", METALLURGICAL TRANSACTIONS, (197101), vol. 2, pages 337 - 341, XP002227180 |