EP1264157 - PROBE HEAD WITH TARING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH Carl Zeiss Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | ||
Former [2002/50] | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Carl Zeiss 89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE | ||
For:GB
Carl-Zeiss-Stiftung trading as Carl Zeiss 89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIEDMANN, Wolfgang Hutsteinweg 28 73434 Aalen / DE | 02 /
RUCK, Otto Nelkenstrasse 9 73479 Pfahlheim / DE | 03 /
AUBELE, Eugen Poststrasse 5 89558 Böhmenkirch / DE | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Henckell, Carsten Carl Zeiss Patentabteilung 73446 Oberkochen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Henckell, Carsten Carl Zeiss Patentabteilung 73446 Oberkochen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02750530.4 | 28.02.2002 | [2002/50] | WO2002EP02162 | Priority number, date | DE2001111377 | 09.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10111377 | [2002/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02073123 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1264157 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1264157 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01B5/00, G01B5/008 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
G01B5/0016 (EP);
G01B7/012 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/29] |
Former [2002/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | TASTKOPF MIT EINER TARIERUNG | [2002/50] | English: | PROBE HEAD WITH TARING DEVICE | [2002/50] | French: | TETE PALPEUSE DOTEE D'UNE TARE | [2002/50] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 21.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4882848 (BREYER KARL-HERMANN ET AL) [A] 1,16 * column 10, line 24 - column 11, line 32 *; | [DA]DE2242355 (FA. CARL ZEISS) [DA] 1,16 * claim 1 * |