EP1401917 - MULTIMODAL POLYAMIDES, POLYESTERS AND POLYESTER AMIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMRI, Igor Grampovcanova 17 1125 Ljubljana / SI | 02 /
VON BERNSTORFF, Bernd-Steffen An der Altenbach 41 67157 Wachenheim / DE | 03 /
RAUSCHENBERGER, Volker Schumannstr. 18 67304 Eisenberg / DE | 04 /
HORN, Hans, Christoph Römerstr. 22 67245 Lambsheim / DE | [2004/14] | Application number, filing date | 02751023.9 | 13.06.2002 | [2004/14] | WO2002EP06486 | Priority number, date | DE2001129525 | 21.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10129525 | [2004/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03000772 | Date: | 03.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1401917 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/00 | [2004/14] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 21.01.2004 | SI | 21.01.2004 | Title | German: | MULTIMODALE POLYAMIDE, POLYESTER UND POLYESTERAMIDE | [2004/14] | English: | MULTIMODAL POLYAMIDES, POLYESTERS AND POLYESTER AMIDES | [2004/14] | French: | POLYAMIDES MULTIMODAUX, POLYESTERS ET POLYESTERAMIDES | [2004/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 10.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/02] | 28.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |