EP1404485 - METHOD AND USE OF A DEVICE FOR METAL-CUTTING MACHINING A WORKPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/15] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR METAL-CUTTING MACHINING A WORKPIECE | ||
[2010/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dürr Ecoclean GmbH Mühlenstrasse 12 70794 Filderstadt / DE | [2004/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALVAREZ-VEGA, Antonio Am Hügel 32 52224 Stolberg / DE | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Hörner, Andreas HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Hörner, Andreas Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte GBR Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02751027.0 | 14.06.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002EP06552 | Priority number, date | DE2001133003 | 06.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10133003 | [2004/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03004216 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1404485 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1404485 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23P25/00, B23Q11/00, B23Q11/10 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
B23Q11/0042 (EP,US);
B23Q11/1061 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49995 (EP,US);
Y10T408/03 (EP,US);
Y10T408/44 (EP,US);
Y10T408/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUM SPANENDEN BEARBEITEN EINES WERKSTÜCKS | [2010/39] | English: | METHOD AND USE OF A DEVICE FOR METAL-CUTTING MACHINING A WORKPIECE | [2010/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET UTILISATION D'UN DISPOSITIF POUR USINER UNE PIÈCE PAR ENLÈVEMENT DE COPEAUX | [2010/39] |
Former [2004/15] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SPANENDEN BEARBEITEN EINES WERKSTÜCKS | ||
Former [2004/15] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR METAL-CUTTING MACHINING A WORKPIECE | ||
Former [2004/15] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR USINER UNE PIECE PAR ENLEVEMENT DE COPEAUX | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2003 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 01.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.02.2011 | DK | 23.02.2011 | FI | 23.02.2011 | IE | 23.02.2011 | NL | 23.02.2011 | SE | 23.02.2011 | TR | 23.02.2011 | GR | 24.05.2011 | LU | 14.06.2011 | PT | 23.06.2011 | BE | 30.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
LU | 14.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 23.02.2011 | |
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3176387 (ARGUESO JR LUIS M, et al) [X] 1-3,5,9,10,13 * the whole document *; | [A]US4854026 (AVERDICK GUENTER [DE], et al) [A] 6-8 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE4424452 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [AD] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE19528429 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [AD] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP1166958 (TECHSPACE AERO SA [BE]) [PA] 1,13* the whole document * |