EP1392914 - METHOD AND AQUEOUS COMPOSITION FOR THE PRODUCTION OF IMPROVED PULP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dequest AG Bundesplatz 1 6300 Zug / CH | [2010/21] |
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states Thermphos Trading GmbH Bundesplatz 1 6300 Zug / CH | ||
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states Solutia Inc. 575 Maryville Centre Drive St. Louis, Missouri 63141 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMPSON, Jacob, Owen 5295 Waterman Avenue, B41 St. Louis, MO 63108 / US | 02 /
VERRETT, Sheldon, Phillip 6 Crabapple Court Olivette, MO 63132 / US | 03 /
TSCHIRNER, Ulrike, Waltraud 1517 Briarknoll Drive Arden Hill, MN 55112 / US | 04 /
LI, Wei 1216 Ray Place St. Paul, MN 55108 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2004/10] | 01 /
THOMPSON, Jacob, Owen 5295 Waterman Avenue, #B41 St. Louis, MO 63108 / US | ||
02 /
VERRETT, Sheldon, Phillip 6 Crabapple Court Olivette, MO 63132 / US | |||
03 /
TSCHIRNER, Ulrike, Waltraud 1517 Briarknoll Drive Arden Hill, MN 55112 / US | |||
04 /
LI, Wei 1216 Ray Place St. Paul, MN 55108 / US | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | Isenbruck, Günter Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2004/10] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02752029.5 | 05.06.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002US17775 | Priority number, date | US20010296296P | 06.06.2001 Original published format: US 296296 P | US20010302487P | 02.07.2001 Original published format: US 302487 P | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02099184 | Date: | 12.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1392914 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1392914 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D21C3/02 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
D21C3/222 (EP,US);
D21C3/02 (EP,US);
D21C9/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND WÄSSERIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERBESSERTEM ZELLSTOFF | [2004/10] | English: | METHOD AND AQUEOUS COMPOSITION FOR THE PRODUCTION OF IMPROVED PULP | [2004/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PATE AMELIOREE | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 01.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   16.08.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.12.2010 | TR | 22.12.2010 | GR | 23.03.2011 | IE | 05.06.2011 | LU | 05.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 05.06.2011 | ||
LU | 05.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 05.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 05.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 22.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3448003 (MERRIMAN WAYNE R) [X] 1,45-47,94-96 * the whole document * [A] 1-97; | [DX]US3979385 (WOLLMANN KLAUS, et al) [DX] 1-46 * the whole document *; | [DX]US4006182 (PLOGER WALTER, et al) [DX] 1-46 * the whole document *; | [XA]US4851082 (MITA AKIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,45-47,94-96 * examples 1,3; claims 1,2,10 * [A] 1-96; | [DX]US5221487 (CARTER CHARLES G [US]) [DX] 1-46 * the whole document *; | [DX]US5261491 (STEWART NEVIN J [GB], et al) [DX] 1-46* the whole document *; | [X]US5306392 (MITA AKIO [JP]) [X] 1-97 * column 3, line 44 - column 12, line 68; figure 1; examples 1,3,8; table 1 *; | [XA]US5320757 (ZIDOVEC DAVOR F [US], et al) [X] 1,45-47,94-96 * column 4 * [A] 1-97; | [XA]US5441602 (HARRIS ARTHUR [GB], et al) [X] 1,45-47,94-96 * column 1, line 7 - column 3, line 27 * [A] 1-97; | [DX]DE19857251 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DX] 1-46 * the whole document * |