EP1406606 - CARBAMATE COMPOUNDS FOR USE IN PREVENTING OR TREATING NEUROPATHIC PAIN AND CLUSTER AND MIGRAINE HEADACHE-ASSOCIATED PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc. U.S. Route No.202 Raritan, NJ 08869-0602 / US | [2004/19] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states Ortho-McNell Pharmaceutical, Inc. U.S. Route 202 Raritan, NJ 08869-0602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CODD, Ellen, C. 736 Cathcart Road Blue Bell, PA 19422 / US | 02 /
PLATA-SALAMAN, Carlos, R. 1313 Squire Drive Amble, PA 19002 / US | 03 /
ZHAO, Boyu 105 Weymouth Circle Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02752248.1 | 11.07.2002 | [2004/16] | WO2002US21787 | Priority number, date | US20010305687P | 16.07.2001 Original published format: US 305687 P | US20020192973 | 11.07.2002 Original published format: US 192973 | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03007936 | Date: | 30.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1406606 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1406606 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/325, A61K31/27, A61P25/06 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/325 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/27 (EP,US);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/17] | A61K31/325, A61P25/06 | ||
Former IPC [2004/16] | A61K31/325 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON CARBAMAT-VERBINDUNGEN ZUR PRÄVENTION ODER BEHANDLUNG VON NEUROPATHISCHEN SCHMERZEN UND MIGRÄNEARTIGEN KOPFSCHMERZEN | [2004/16] | English: | CARBAMATE COMPOUNDS FOR USE IN PREVENTING OR TREATING NEUROPATHIC PAIN AND CLUSTER AND MIGRAINE HEADACHE-ASSOCIATED PAIN | [2004/16] | French: | COMPOSES DE CARBAMATE DESTINE A ETRE UTILISES DANS LA PREVENTION OU LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR NEUROPATHIQUE ET DE LA DOULEUR ASSOCIEE A LA CEPHALEE VASCULAIRE DE HORTON ET A LA MIGRAINE | [2004/16] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.02.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 06.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6103759 (CHOI YONG MOON [US], et al) [A] 1-26* claim - *; | [PX]WO0207822 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US]) [PX] 1-26 * claim - * |