EP1406548 - EXPANDABLE ORTHOPEDIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Expanding Orthopedics Inc. One Beacon Street, 30th Floor Boston, MA 02108 / US | [2004/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVY, Mark, M. Etzion Street 34 43563 Raanana / IL | 02 /
GREENBERG, Ilan Geula Street 15 33198 Haifa / IL | [2004/32] |
Former [2004/16] | 01 /
LEVY, Mark, M. Etzion Street 34 43563 Raanana / IL | ||
02 /
GREENBERG, Ilan Geula Street 1b 33198 Haifa / IL | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 02752335.6 | 11.07.2002 | [2004/16] | WO2002US22382 | Priority number, date | US20010907514 | 16.07.2001 Original published format: US 907514 | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03007830 | Date: | 30.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1406548 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1406548 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/72 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
A61B17/7266 (EP,US);
A61B17/744 (EP,US);
A61B17/746 (EP,US);
A61B17/7291 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSPREIZBARE VORRICHTUNG FÜR ORTHOPÄDIE | [2004/16] | English: | EXPANDABLE ORTHOPEDIC DEVICE | [2004/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF ORTHOPEDIQUE EXTENSIBLE | [2005/05] |
Former [2004/16] | DISPOSITIF ORTHOPEDI QUE EXTENSIBLE | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 28.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 01.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.09.2005 | BE | 21.09.2005 | CY | 21.09.2005 | CZ | 21.09.2005 | EE | 21.09.2005 | FI | 21.09.2005 | IT | 21.09.2005 | NL | 21.09.2005 | SK | 21.09.2005 | TR | 21.09.2005 | BG | 21.12.2005 | DK | 21.12.2005 | GR | 21.12.2005 | SE | 21.12.2005 | ES | 01.01.2006 | PT | 21.02.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 21.09.2005 | |
BE | 21.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2005 | ||
EE | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
IT | 21.09.2005 | ||
NL | 21.09.2005 | ||
SK | 21.09.2005 | ||
TR | 21.09.2005 | ||
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
ES | 01.01.2006 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 21.09.2005 | |
BE | 21.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2005 | ||
EE | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
IT | 21.09.2005 | ||
NL | 21.09.2005 | ||
SK | 21.09.2005 | ||
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
ES | 01.01.2006 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 21.09.2005 | |
BE | 21.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
IT | 21.09.2005 | ||
NL | 21.09.2005 | ||
SK | 21.09.2005 | ||
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
ES | 01.01.2006 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 21.09.2005 | |
BE | 21.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
NL | 21.09.2005 | ||
SK | 21.09.2005 | ||
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
ES | 01.01.2006 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 21.09.2005 | |
BE | 21.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
NL | 21.09.2005 | ||
SK | 21.09.2005 | ||
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/29] | BE | 21.09.2005 | |
CZ | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
NL | 21.09.2005 | ||
SK | 21.09.2005 | ||
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | BE | 21.09.2005 | |
CZ | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
NL | 21.09.2005 | ||
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 21.09.2005 | |
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
NL | 21.09.2005 | ||
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 21.09.2005 | |
NL | 21.09.2005 | ||
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | FI | 21.09.2005 | |
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 21.09.2005 | |
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4204531 (AGINSKY YACOV [IL]) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE3146065 (ORTOPEDIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * figure 2 *; | [X]FR2653006 (DORANGE ARNAUD) [X] 1-4,7-11,17-22,25,27,28 * page 3, line 1 - line 12 * * page 4, line 8 - line 20 * * page 6, line 17 - line 24 * * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 20 * * figures 5,7,8 *; | [X]US5437674 (WORCEL ALEXANDRE [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,12-14,23,24,26 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 2 * * column 5, line 3 - line 28 * * figures 1-3,6,8,9 *; | [X]FR2741256 (ADVANCED TECHNICAL FABRICATION [FR]) [X] 1-4,7-9 * page 4, line 12 - page 8, line 9 * * figure - *; | [YA]EP0922437 (ORTOMEDICAL S P A [IT]) [Y] 6 * column 4, line 25 - line 46 * * figure 11 *[A] 1; | [XY]WO0128443 (LEVY MARK [IL]) [X] 1-5,7-12,17-22,25-28 * page 48, line 27 - page 54, line 24 * * figures 70A-77B * [Y] 6; | [X]WO0134045 (SYNTHES AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,13-17,23,24 * page 6, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4 * * figures 1-4 * |