EP1415463 - ROBUST RECEPTION OF DIGITAL BROADCAST TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing S.A. 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMASWAMY, Kumar 7701 Tamarron Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 02 /
KNUTSON, Paul, Gothard 5 Huron Way Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | 03 /
COOPER, Jeffrey, Allen 11 Toth Lane Rocky Hill, NJ 08543 / US | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Rumpler, Wolfgang ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Rumpler, Wolfgang, Dr. Hofstetter, Schurack & Skora, Patentanwälte, Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/19] | Cour, Pierre THOMSON, 46 quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Application number, filing date | 02752407.3 | 17.07.2002 | [2004/19] | WO2002US22723 | Priority number, date | US20010306586P | 19.07.2001 Original published format: US 306586 P | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03009578 | Date: | 30.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1415463 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/58, H04N7/68 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
H04L1/02 (EP,US);
H04N7/015 (KR);
H04H20/16 (EP,US);
H04H20/40 (EP,US);
H04H60/11 (EP,US);
H04H60/27 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/895 (EP,US);
H04N21/23406 (EP,US);
H04N21/234327 (EP,US);
H04N21/2365 (EP,US);
H04N21/2383 (EP,US);
H04N21/25816 (EP,US);
H04N21/2585 (EP,US);
H04N21/4181 (EP,US);
H04N21/42684 (EP,US);
H04N21/4331 (EP,US);
H04N21/4347 (EP,US);
H04N21/4382 (EP,US);
H04N21/44209 (EP,US);
H04N21/6112 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/19] | H04N5/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROBUSTER EMPFANG DIGITALER RUNDSENDEÜBERTRAGUNGEN | [2004/19] | English: | ROBUST RECEPTION OF DIGITAL BROADCAST TRANSMISSION | [2004/19] | French: | RECEPTION FIABLE DE SIGNAUX DE DIFFUSION NUMERIQUES | [2004/19] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 18.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/43] | 24.06.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CA1065409 (CANADA MAJESTY IN RIGHT OF) [X] 1,2,5,6,10,11,14,15 * the whole document *; | [X]US5446759 (CAMPANA JR THOMAS J [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,10,11,14,15 * abstract * * column 21, line 34 - column 23, line 65 * * column 56, line 1 - column 60, line 35 * * column 66, line 29 - column 69, line 67 * * figures 11,12,17-20,22,34 *; | [X]JP2000078116 (FUJITSU LTD, et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0025] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0040] * * paragraphs [0060] - [0095] * * figures 1-15 *; | [A] - STEELE R ET AL, "TIME DIVERSITY WITH ADAPTIVE ERROR DETECTION TO COMBAT RAYLEIGH FADING IN DIGITAL MOBILE RADIO", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (198303), vol. COM-31, no. 3, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 378 - 387, XP000758658 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO0014967 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [Y]US6038257 (BRUSEWITZ HARALD [SE], et al); | [Y]US6418549 (RAMCHANDRAN KANNAN [US], et al); | [A]US4870497 (CHAMZAS CHRISTODOULOS [US], et al); | [A]US6148005 (PAUL SANJOY [US], et al); | [A]US6195024 (FALLON JAMES J [US]); | [T]US6414725 (CLARIN EDSEL A [US], et al) |