EP1421707 - SPREAD SPECTRUM RECEIVER ARCHITECTURES AND METHODS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSR Technology Inc. 217 Devcon Drive San Jose CA 95112 / US | [2016/16] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states SiRF Technology, Inc. 217 Devcon Drive San Jose, CA 95112 / US | ||
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states SiRF Technology, Inc. 148 East Brokaw Road San Jose, CA 95112 / US | ||
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KING, Thomas, Michael 9283 S. Stanley Place Tempe, AZ 85284 / US | 02 /
RIEMER, Denise, C. 1840 Fox Meadow Court Gurnee, IL 60031 / US | 03 /
HARBOUR, Robert, B. 431 South Ironwood Street Gilbert, AZ 85296 / US | 04 /
HOOVER, Andrew, P. 7707 Grovedale Trail Austin, TX 78729 / US | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/49] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2004/22] | Gibson, Sarah Jane, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02752465.1 | 19.07.2002 | [2004/22] | WO2002US22961 | Priority number, date | US20010931121 | 16.08.2001 Original published format: US 931121 | [2004/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03017503 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1421707 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/29, G01S19/30, G01S19/37, H04B1/7075 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
H04B1/70752 (EP,US);
G01S19/29 (EP,US);
G01S19/30 (EP,US);
G01S19/37 (EP,US);
H04B1/70753 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70715 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/22] | H04B1/69 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPREIZSPEKTRUM-EMPFÄNGERARCHITEKTUREN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2004/22] | English: | SPREAD SPECTRUM RECEIVER ARCHITECTURES AND METHODS THEREFOR | [2004/22] | French: | ARCHITECTURES DE RECEPTEURS A SPECTRE ETALE ET PROCEDES CORRESPONDANTS | [2004/22] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 20.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.06.2017 | 26.06.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/22] | 12.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 08.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6091785 (LENNEN GARY R [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 6, line 26 - line 62 ** column 8, line 26 - line 67 *; | [A]US6195041 (GARDNER WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 30 - column 6, line 5; claims 1-5 * | International search | [A]US5901171 (KOHLI SANJAI [US], et al); | [X]US5982811 (HARRISON DANIEL DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US6009118 (TIEMANN JEROME JOHNSON [US], et al); | [A]US6208291 (KRASNER NORMAN F [US]) |