EP1425249 - A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A BAR-SHAPED PREFORM AS WELL AS A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING OPTICAL FIBRES FROM SUCH A BAR-SHAPED PREFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Draka Fibre Technology B.V. Zwaanstraat 1 5651 CA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMONS, Dennis, Robert De Bazelstraat 3 NL-5624 AT Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BLOEMENDAL, Arnold Henkenshage 6 NL-5653 PX Eindhoven / NL | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Valkonet, Rutger, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Valkonet, Rutger, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/24] | Valkonet, Rutger, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02753303.3 | 28.08.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002NL00564 | Priority number, date | NL20011018951 | 13.09.2001 Original published format: NL 1018951 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03022760 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1425249 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1425249 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/018 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
C03B37/01853 (EP,US);
C03B37/01807 (EP,US);
C03B37/0183 (EP,US);
C03B2201/12 (EP,US);
C03B2201/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER STABFÖRMIGEN VORFORM SOWIE AUS EINER DERARTIGEN VORFORM HERGESTELLTE LICHTLEITFASERN | [2004/24] | English: | A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A BAR-SHAPED PREFORM AS WELL AS A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING OPTICAL FIBRES FROM SUCH A BAR-SHAPED PREFORM | [2004/24] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE PREFORME EN FORME DE BARRE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE FIBRES OPTIQUES A PARTIR D'UNE TELLE PREFORME | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 14.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2006 | BE | 10.05.2006 | CH | 10.05.2006 | CY | 10.05.2006 | CZ | 10.05.2006 | EE | 10.05.2006 | FI | 10.05.2006 | LI | 10.05.2006 | SK | 10.05.2006 | TR | 10.05.2006 | BG | 10.08.2006 | DK | 10.08.2006 | SE | 10.08.2006 | GR | 11.08.2006 | ES | 21.08.2006 | GB | 28.08.2006 | IE | 28.08.2006 | LU | 28.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | PT | 10.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
EE | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
TR | 10.05.2006 | ||
BG | 10.08.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
GB | 28.08.2006 | ||
IE | 28.08.2006 | ||
LU | 28.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
EE | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
BG | 10.08.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
GB | 28.08.2006 | ||
IE | 28.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
EE | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
GB | 28.08.2006 | ||
IE | 28.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
GB | 28.08.2006 | ||
IE | 28.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
GB | 28.08.2006 | ||
IE | 28.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
IE | 28.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
IE | 28.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 10.08.2006 | |
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 10.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS59195549 ; | [A]FR2576693 (COMP GENERALE ELECTRICITE [FR]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 6 ** page 4, line 29 - line 34 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850315), vol. 009, no. 059, Database accession no. (C - 270), & JP59195549 A 19841106 (MITSUBISHI KINZOKU KK) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |