EP1412656 - CRANKSHAFT DAMPER WITH INTEGRAL PULSE RING AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2008 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gates Corporation 1551 Wewatta Street Denver, CO 80202 / US | [2007/45] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states THE GATES CORPORATION 900 South Broadway Denver, Colorado 80209 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HODJAT, Yahya 410 North Baldwin Oxford, MI 48371-3410 / US | 02 /
CADARETTE, Marc 460 Wellington, Unit 203 London, Ontario, N6A 3P8 / CA | 03 /
ROES, John 98 Egerton Street Strathroy, Ontario N7G 3P8 / CA | 04 /
WILSON, Don 12 Pearson Avenue Strathroy, Ontario N7G 3X9 / CA | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2004/18] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02753420.5 | 30.07.2002 | [2004/18] | WO2002US24117 | Priority number, date | US20010310034P | 03.08.2001 Original published format: US 310034 P | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03014596 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1412656 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1412656 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/126, B21D53/26 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
B21D53/261 (EP,US);
F16F15/126 (EP,KR,US);
F16H2055/366 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49456 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4946 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49467 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KURBELWELLENDÄMPFER MIT INTEGRIERTER INDEXSCHEIBE UND HERSTELLVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2004/18] | English: | CRANKSHAFT DAMPER WITH INTEGRAL PULSE RING AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION | [2004/18] | French: | AMORTISSEUR POUR VILEBREQUIN AVEC BAGUE D'IMPULSION INTEGREE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIE | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 09.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.12.2007 | CH | 05.12.2007 | CY | 05.12.2007 | CZ | 05.12.2007 | DK | 05.12.2007 | EE | 05.12.2007 | FI | 05.12.2007 | LI | 05.12.2007 | NL | 05.12.2007 | SK | 05.12.2007 | TR | 05.12.2007 | BG | 05.03.2008 | SE | 05.03.2008 | GR | 06.03.2008 | PT | 05.05.2008 | IE | 30.07.2008 | LU | 30.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/32] | BE | 05.12.2007 | |
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CY | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
IE | 30.07.2008 | ||
LU | 30.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | BE | 05.12.2007 | |
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CY | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
IE | 30.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | BE | 05.12.2007 | |
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | BE | 05.12.2007 | |
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | BE | 05.12.2007 | |
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | BE | 05.12.2007 | |
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | BE | 05.12.2007 | |
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | BE | 05.12.2007 | |
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | BE | 05.12.2007 | |
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | CH | 05.12.2007 | |
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 05.12.2007 | |
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]DE4426529 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * figure 3 * * column 3, line 18 - line 32 * [A] 9 [Y] 7,8; | [A]DE19528120 (WINKELMANN & PANNHOFF GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP0947670 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 7,8 * figures 1,2 *; | [PA]EP1146255 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [PA] 1 * figure 1 * | by applicant | US5203223 | US5966996 | US5987952 |