EP1373906 - METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING CHRONIC INTESTINAL INFLAMMATORY DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE HOSPITALIER REGIONAL ET UNIVERSITAIRE DE LILLE 2, avenue Oscar-Lambret 59037 Lille Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states CENTRE HOSPITALIER REGIONAL ET UNIVERSITAIRE DE LILLE 2, avenue Oscar-Lambret 59037 Lille Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESREUMAUX, Pierre 121, avenue du Parc Monceau F-59800 Lille / FR | 02 /
COLOMBEL, Jean-Frédéric 52, rue Faidherbe F-59110 La Madeleine / FR | 03 /
DUBUQUOY, Laurent 3, rue de Landouzy F-02500 Eparcy / FR | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02753742.2 | 27.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002FR01076 | Priority number, date | FR20010004128 | 27.03.2001 Original published format: FR 0104128 | [2004/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02077651 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1373906 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/74, G01N33/68, C12Q1/68 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
G01N33/74 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
G01N33/6875 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE VON CHRONISCHEN ENTZÜNDLICHEN DARMERKRANKUNGEN | [2004/01] | English: | METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING CHRONIC INTESTINAL INFLAMMATORY DISEASES | [2004/01] | French: | METHODE DE DIAGNOSTIC DE MALADIES INFLAMMATOIRES CHRONIQUES DE L'INTESTIN | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 02.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/09] | 15.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/09] | Request for further processing for: | 28.08.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 28.08.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.10.2006 | Decision despatched | 17.02.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 17.02.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.03.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6166049 (SMITH STEPHEN ALISTAIR [GB]) [X] 19,26,27* the whole document *; | [X] - HAFRAOUI S ET AL, "Ulcerative colitis is associated with a mucosal deficit in PPARgamma.", GASTROENTEROLOGY, Digestive Disease Week and the 100th Annual Meeting of the American Gastroenterological Association;Orlando, Florida, USA; May 16-19, 1999, (199904), vol. 116, no. 4 PART 2, ISSN 0016-5085, page A689, XP001063949 [X] 1-27 * abstract * | [X] - HAFRAOUI S ET AL, "Mucosal deficit of peroxysome proliferator activated receptor gamma in ulcerative colitis.", IMMUNOLOGY LETTERS, 10th International Congress of Mucosal Imunology;Amsterdam, Netherlands; June 27-July 1, 1999, (19990615), vol. 69, no. 1, ISSN 0165-2478, pages 161 - 162, XP001063972 [X] 1-27 * abstract * | [X] - DESREUMAUX PIERRE ET AL, "Inflammatory alterations in mesenteric adipose tissue in Crohn's disease.", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (199907), vol. 117, no. 1, ISSN 0016-5085, pages 73 - 81, XP002190792 [X] 1-27 * abstract * * page 75, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 76, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-5085(99)70552-4 | [X] - LEFEBVRE A -M ET AL, "Peroxisome proliferator-activated receptor gamma is induced during differentiation of colon epithelium cells.", JOURNAL OF ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1999), vol. 162, no. 3, ISSN 0022-0795, pages 331 - 340, XP001064030 [X] 1-27 * abstract * * page 332, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 334, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1677/joe.0.1620331 | [X] - SU CHINYU G ET AL, "A novel therapy for colitis utilizing PPAR-gamma ligands to inhibit the epithelial inflammatory response.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (199908), vol. 104, no. 4, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 383 - 389, XP002190819 [X] 19,26,27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI7145 |