EP1425342 - NOVEL SYMMETRICAL SUBSTITUTED BENZALDEHYDE ALDITOL DERIVATIVES AND COMPOSITIONS AND ARTICLES CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Milliken & Company 920 Milliken Road Spartanburg, SC 29303 / US | [2004/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, John, D. 334 West Autumn Ridge Rd. Moore, SC 29369 / US | 02 /
DOTSON, Darin, L. 4150 Shepard Rd. Spartanburg, SC 29301 / US | 03 /
SHEPPARD, Shawn, R. 348 Annabel Drive Spartanburg, SC 29316 / US | 04 /
MEHL, Nathan, A. 253 Preston Drive Moore, SC 29369 / US | 05 /
JONES, Jeffrey, R. 138 Coastline Drive Inman, SC 29349 / US | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02753760.4 | 01.03.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002US06369 | Priority number, date | US20010815476 | 23.03.2001 Original published format: US 815476 | US20010815630 | 23.03.2001 Original published format: US 815630 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02077086 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1425342 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.02.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/15 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
A61K8/042 (EP);
A61K8/345 (EP);
A61K8/498 (EP);
A61Q15/00 (EP);
C07D493/04 (EP);
C08K5/156 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE SYMMETRISCH SUBSTITUIERTE BENZALDEHYDALDITOLDERIVATE UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND GEGENSTÄNDE | [2004/24] | English: | NOVEL SYMMETRICAL SUBSTITUTED BENZALDEHYDE ALDITOL DERIVATIVES AND COMPOSITIONS AND ARTICLES CONTAINING SAME | [2004/24] | French: | NOUVEAUX DERIVES D'ALDITOL DE BENZALDEHYDE A SUBSTITUTION SYMETRIQUE ET COMPOSITIONS ET ARTICLES LES CONTENANT | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.08.2003 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 06.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/13] | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2004 | 31.03.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9846672 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * page 93, line 46 - line 49; claim 25 *; | JP57185341 [ ] (NEW JAPAN CHEMICAL CO., LTD., JAPAN; JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO., LTD.); | [X]FR2571690 (MONARCH MARKING SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 28, 14 and 15 *; | [X]EP0051681 (NEW JAPAN CHEM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * example 11 * | [X] - "Polybutadiene compositions for injection molding", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1983:199596, URL: STN, XP002303762 [X] 1,3 * abstract and RN 85697-57-0 * | [X] - KOBAYASHI, TOSHIAKI ET AL KOBAYASHI, TOSHIAKI ET AL, "The stereostructure of bis(O-p-isobutylbenzylidene)sorbitol The stereostructure of bis(O-p-isobutylbenzylidene)sorbitol", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1993:671515, URL: STN, XP002303763 [X] 1 * RNs 151434-97-8, 151358-40-6, 151358-39-3 * | [ ] - NIPPON KAGAKU KAISHI SO - NIPPON KAGAKU KAISHI, (1993), vol. 7, ISSN 0369-4577, pages 850 - 856 | [X] - KOBAYASHI, TOSHIAKI ET AL, "Reaction mechanism of 1,3:2,4-bis-O-(p-isobutylbenzylidene)-D- sorbitol formation", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1994:559700, URL: STN, XP002303764 [X] 1 * RN 157605-02-2 * | [ ] - NIPPON KAGAKU KAISHI, (1994), vol. 8, ISSN 0369-4577, pages 713 - 718 | International search | [X]US5049605 ; | [X]US4371645 |