EP1399831 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONVERTING A DIAGNOSTIC INTERFACE TO SPI STANDARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRSCHNER, Manfred Reinsburgstrasse 204 70197 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/13] | Application number, filing date | 02754180.4 | 04.06.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002DE02023 | Priority number, date | DE2001128753 | 13.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10128753 | [2004/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02101349 | Date: | 19.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1399831 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1399831 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
F02D41/28 (EP,US);
F02D41/22 (EP,US);
F02D41/266 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/11] |
Former [2004/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR UMSETZUNG EINER DIAGNOSESCHNITTSTELLE AUF STANDARD-SPI | [2004/13] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONVERTING A DIAGNOSTIC INTERFACE TO SPI STANDARD | [2004/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE TRANSFORMER UNE INTERFACE DE DIAGNOSTIC EN INTERFACE STANDARD SPI | [2004/13] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 28.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0857616 (MAGNETI MARELLI SPA [IT]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19837242 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE4032926 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0477309 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document * |