EP1415079 - METHOD AND CONTROL UNIT FOR THE FUNCTIONAL DIAGNOSIS OF A FUEL TANK VENTILATION VALVE IN A FUEL TANK SYSTEM, ESPECIALLY IN A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STREIB, Martin Hohenzollern Strasse 13 71665 Vaihingen / DE | 02 /
LEDERER, Dieter Gartenstrasse 42 71634 Ludwigsburg / DE | 03 /
LEDERLE, Karl-Bernhard Kirchstrasse 7 71272 Renningen / DE | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2004/35] |
Former [2004/19] | Jakelski, Joachim, Dr. Otte & Jakelski Patentanwälte Mollenbachstrasse 37 71229 Leonberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02754259.6 | 21.06.2002 | [2004/19] | WO2002DE02297 | Priority number, date | DE2001136183 | 25.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10136183 | [2004/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03012278 | Date: | 13.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1415079 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1415079 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/08, G01M3/32 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
F02M25/0818 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [2004/52] |
Former [2004/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND STEUERGERÄT ZUR FUNKTIONSDIAGNOSE EINES TANKENTLÜFTUNGSVENTILS EINER BRENNSTOFFTANKANLAGE INSBESONDERE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2004/19] | English: | METHOD AND CONTROL UNIT FOR THE FUNCTIONAL DIAGNOSIS OF A FUEL TANK VENTILATION VALVE IN A FUEL TANK SYSTEM, ESPECIALLY IN A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2004/19] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE POUR DIAGNOSTICS DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE SOUPAPE DE VENTILATION DE RESERVOIR D'INSTALLATION DE RESERVOIR DE CARBURANT, NOTAMMENT D'AUTOMOBILE | [2004/19] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 14.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2731467 (SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE SA [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-10 * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 2; figures 1-3B *; | [X]US5794599 (BLUMENSTOCK ANDREAS [DE]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 30; figures 1A-2 *; | [X]DE10006186 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,7,9 * column 3, line 3 - column 5, line 35 * |