EP1405274 - METHOD FOR VERIFYING THE VALIDITY OF DIGITAL FRANKING NOTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT, BE | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Post AG Charles-de-Gaulle-Strasse 18 53113 Bonn / DE | [2004/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELITZ, Alexander Im Etzental 19 53177 Bonn / DE | 02 /
FERY, Peter Passwiese 24 64673 Zwingenberg / DE | 03 /
HELMUS, Jürgen Birlinghovener Strasse 6a 53229 Bonn / DE | 04 /
HÖHL, Aloysius Friedrich-Harth-Strasse 10 36041 Fulda / DE | 05 /
MEIER, Gunther Am Wembach 41 64354 Reinheim / DE | 06 /
ROBEL, Elke Freiherr-vom-Stein-Strasse 35 59368 Werne / DE | 07 /
STUMM, Dieter Langer Weg 48 26629 Grossefehn / DE | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Jostarndt - Thul, Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02754272.9 | 28.06.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002DE02348 | Priority number, date | DE2001131254 | 01.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10131254 | [2004/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03005307 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1405274 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1405274 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00, G07D7/00, G07D7/20 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
G07B17/00435 (EP,US);
G07B17/00661 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00443 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00709 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00725 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 02.02.2004 | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERPRÜFEN DER GÜLTIGKEIT VON DIGITALEN FREIMACHUNGSVERMERKEN | [2004/15] | English: | METHOD FOR VERIFYING THE VALIDITY OF DIGITAL FRANKING NOTES | [2004/15] | French: | PROCEDE DE VERIFICATION DE LA VALIDITE DE MENTIONS D'AFFRANCHISSEMENT NUMERIQUES | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 15.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.2007
17.08.2007
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.2007
17.08.2007
ADMISSIBLE SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.2007
Siemens AG Abteilung CT IP Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | 30.08.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.01.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.05.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.06.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.06.2009 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 26.04.2011 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2011/26] | Appeal following opposition | 08.07.2009 | Appeal received No. T1484/09 | 21.08.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.04.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.10.2006 | FI | 25.10.2006 | IE | 25.10.2006 | TR | 25.10.2006 | SE | 25.01.2007 | GR | 26.01.2007 | ES | 05.02.2007 | PT | 26.03.2007 | LU | 28.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | NL | 01.01.2009 | DK | 30.06.2009 | AT | 28.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | [2011/31] |
Former [2011/20] | CY | 25.10.2006 | |
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
TR | 25.10.2006 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
LU | 28.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
NL | 01.01.2009 | ||
DK | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | CY | 25.10.2006 | |
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
TR | 25.10.2006 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
LU | 28.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
NL | 01.01.2009 | ||
DK | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/42] | CY | 25.10.2006 | |
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
TR | 25.10.2006 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
LU | 28.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
NL | 01.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | CY | 25.10.2006 | |
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
LU | 28.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
NL | 01.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
NL | 01.01.2009 | ||
Former [2008/22] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | ES | 05.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4461028 (OKUBO HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 68 *; | [A]GB2174039 (PITNEY BOWES INC) [A] 1* page 3, line 59 - line 68; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US5091634 (FINCH JOHN W [CA], et al) [Y] 3 * abstract *; | [X]EP0600646 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [XY]EP0732673 (NEOPOST LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-16 * column 3, line 24 - line 38; figure 1 * * column 5, line 31 - column 6, line 38 * [Y] 3; | [X]US5953427 (CORDERY ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 1 - line 48; figure 8 * * column 13, line 50 - column 14, line 35 * |