EP1417751 - VOLTAGE/CURRENT CONVERSION CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG Am Campeon 1-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2009/26] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASAM, Michael Bergstrasse 1 85250 Wollomoos / DE | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/26] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/20] | Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02754422.0 | 24.07.2002 | [2004/20] | WO2002DE02711 | Priority number, date | DE2001137434 | 31.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10137434 | [2004/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03015262 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1417751 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/343, H03F3/45 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
H03F3/45103 (EP);
H03F3/343 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/20] | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR SPANNUNGS-/STROMWANDLUNG | [2004/20] | English: | VOLTAGE/CURRENT CONVERSION CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT | [2004/20] | French: | CIRCUIT DE CONVERSION TENSION/COURANT | [2004/20] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 03.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/15] | 04.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/15] | 26.11.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5142242 (SCHAFFER GREGORY L) [X] 1-3,6-8 * column 6, line 32 - column 7, line 3; figures 10,11 *; | [XA]EP0269162 (PHILIPS NV) [X] 1,4,5 * column 6, line 22 - column 7, line 24; figure 2 * [A] 9; | [X]EP0910164 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,4,5,7 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0054]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0075]; figure 4 *; | [A]US5491447 (GOETSCHEL CHRISTIAN J ET AL) [A] 9 * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 9; figure 2 * | Examination | EP0785616 | US6230001 |