EP1414677 - FRONT STRUCTURE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE COMPRISING A FRONT BONNET THAT DEFORMS DURING A HEAD IMPACT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADAM OPEL AG 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [2007/46] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Adam Opel AG Patentwesen 80-34 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRETH, Laszlo Mainstrasse 16 64319 Pfungstadt / DE | 02 /
RENNEISEN, Ingo Am Gänsborn 37 65239 Hochheim / DE | 03 /
KERKELING, Christoph Feldbergstrasse 21 55118 Mainz / DE | 04 /
VISINESCU, Radu-Mihail Lettigkautweg 33 60599 Frankfurt / DE | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Daniel, Ulrich W.P. Adam Opel AG Patentwesen 80-34 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Daniel, Ulrich W.P. Adam Opel AG Patentwesen 80-34 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 02754432.9 | 25.07.2002 | [2004/19] | WO2002DE02728 | Priority number, date | DE2001136898 | 28.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10136898 | [2004/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03011658 | Date: | 13.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1414677 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1414677 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/34 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
B60R21/34 (EP);
B62D25/105 (EP);
F16F7/12 (EP);
B60R2021/343 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORDERBAU EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES MIT EINER BEI EINEM KOPFAUFPRALL SICH NACHGIEBIG VERHALTENDEN FRONTHAUBE | [2004/19] | English: | FRONT STRUCTURE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE COMPRISING A FRONT BONNET THAT DEFORMS DURING A HEAD IMPACT | [2004/19] | French: | STRUCTURE AVANT D'AUTOMOBILE COMPRENANT UN CAPOT FRONTAL QUI SE DEFORME EN CAS DE COLLISION DE TETE | [2004/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 15.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.11.2007 | CZ | 14.11.2007 | DK | 14.11.2007 | EE | 14.11.2007 | FI | 14.11.2007 | IE | 14.11.2007 | NL | 14.11.2007 | SK | 14.11.2007 | TR | 14.11.2007 | BG | 14.02.2008 | SE | 14.02.2008 | GR | 15.02.2008 | PT | 14.04.2008 | AT | 25.07.2008 | LU | 25.07.2008 | BE | 31.07.2008 | CH | 31.07.2008 | LI | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/32] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
AT | 25.07.2008 | ||
LU | 25.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
AT | 25.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | FI | 14.11.2007 | |
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19514324 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE19625295 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,5,6,12-14,16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9709203 (ROVER GROUP [GB], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [Y]DE19929048 (AUDI AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,5,6,12-14,16 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2785956 (ALLIBERT IND [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,6,12-14,16 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE19902311 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [DA] 1-19 * the whole document * |