EP1406857 - SUBSTITUTED 1-ARYL-BUT-3-ENYLAMINE AND 1-ARYL-BUT-2-ENYLAMINE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/16] | SUBSTITUTED 1-ARYL-BUT-3-ENYLAMINE AND 1-ARY-BUT-2-ENYLAMINE COMPOUNDS | ||
[2006/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grünenthal GmbH Zieglerstrasse 6 52078 Aachen / DE | [2004/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNDERMANN, Bernd Oppenhofallee 83-85 52066 Aachen / DE | 02 /
MAUL, Corinna Oppenhoffallee 83-85 52066 Aachen / DE | 03 /
BUSCHMANN, Helmut Carrer Est, 24 E-08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES | 04 /
KÖGEL, Babette-Yvonne Am Deans 28 52379 Langerwehe-Hamaich / DE | [2004/16] | Application number, filing date | 02754818.9 | 03.07.2002 | [2004/16] | WO2002EP07381 | Priority number, date | DE2001132747 | 05.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10132747 | [2004/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03004452 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1406857 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1406857 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07C211/28, A61P25/04, A61P25/24, A61P25/28, A61P27/00, A61K31/137 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
C07C211/28 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 05.02.2004 | LV | 05.02.2004 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 05.02.2004 | SI | 05.02.2004 | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE 1-ARYL-BUT-3-ENYLAMIN- UND 1-ARYL-BUT-2-ENYLAMINVERBINDUNGEN | [2006/52] | English: | SUBSTITUTED 1-ARYL-BUT-3-ENYLAMINE AND 1-ARYL-BUT-2-ENYLAMINE COMPOUNDS | [2006/52] | French: | COMPOSES DE 1-ARYL-BUT-3-ENYLAMINES ET 1-ARYL-BUT-2-ENYLAMINES SUBSTITUES | [2006/52] |
Former [2004/16] | SUBSTITUIERTE 1-ARYL-BUT-3-ENYLAMIN- UND 1-ARY-BUT-2-ENYLAMINVERBINDUNGEN | ||
Former [2004/16] | SUBSTITUTED 1-ARYL-BUT-3-ENYLAMINE AND 1-ARY-BUT-2-ENYLAMINE COMPOUNDS | ||
Former [2004/16] | COMPOSES DE 1-ARYL-BUT-3-ENYLAMINES ET 1-ARY-BUT-2-ENYLAMINES SUBSTITUES | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 10.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.02.2007 | CZ | 21.02.2007 | DK | 21.02.2007 | EE | 21.02.2007 | FI | 21.02.2007 | IE | 21.02.2007 | SK | 21.02.2007 | TR | 21.02.2007 | BG | 15.05.2007 | SE | 21.05.2007 | GR | 22.05.2007 | LU | 03.07.2007 | PT | 23.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 21.02.2007 | |
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
LU | 03.07.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 21.02.2007 | |
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | DK | 21.02.2007 | |
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | DK | 21.02.2007 | |
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | DK | 21.02.2007 | |
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 21.02.2007 | |
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE963424 (THOMAE GMBH DR K) [A] 1-30 * page 2, line 56 - line 68 * * page 3, line 24 - line 25 * * page 3, line 58 - line 104 * * example 14 * * Eintragungen 3-4 auf Seite 13 und 5-6 auf Seite 18;; claim 1 *; | [A]US3564100 (FRANKUS ERNST, et al) [A] 1-30 * Formel I und IV; column 2, line 11 - line 13; claim 1 *; | [A]US5811582 (BUSCHMANN HELMUT HEINRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-30 * Beispiele insbesondere Beispiel 26; column 1, line 5 - column 5, line 11; claims 1-6 *; | [A] - LEDNICER D ET AL, "PARTLY REDUCED BIPHENYLS AS CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM AGENTS 1. 4-ARYLCYCLOHEX-3-ENYLAMINES", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1972), vol. 15, no. 12, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1235 - 1238, XP000990795 [A] 1-30 * Schema II, Komponente 9, 10, 13, 14;; tables I,VI * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00282a008 |