EP1395147 - ARMCHAIR ADJUSTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moreno, Jean 141 Allée de la Tour 01700 Beynost / FR | For all designated states Moreno, Jean Le Fayet 38540 Valencin / FR | [2004/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORENO, Jean LE FAYET F-38540 VALENCIN / FR | [2004/11] | Representative(s) | Delorme, Nicolas Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | Delorme, Nicolas Cabinet Germain & Maureau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02755073.0 | 11.06.2002 | [2004/11] | WO2002FR01993 | Priority number, date | FR20010007602 | 11.06.2001 Original published format: FR 0107602 | [2004/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02100215 | Date: | 19.12.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1395147 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47C1/06, A47C3/30 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
A47C1/06 (EP,US);
A47C1/0244 (EP,US);
A47C1/10 (EP,US);
A47C3/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSTELLVORRICHTUNG FÜR STÜHLE | [2004/11] | English: | ARMCHAIR ADJUSTING DEVICE | [2004/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE POUR FAUTEUIL | [2004/11] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 06.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/31] | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   12.11.2007 | 30.06.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2332904 (ELLINGER FLORA H) [A] 1 * page 2, column 1, line 53 - line 60; figure - *; | [A]US4918767 (BENTING GARY M [US]); | [A]US3368845 (TERUO WATANABE) |