EP1425037 - BACTERIAL VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acambis Research Limited Peterhouse Technology Park, 100, Fulbourn Road Cambridge CB1 9PT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Acambis Research Limited Peterhouse Technology Park, 100, Fulbourn Road Cambridge CB1 9PT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURNER, Arthur Keith, Acambis Research Limited Peterhouse Technology Park, 100 Fulbourn Road Cambridge CB1 9PT / GB | 02 /
GREENWOOD, Judith, Acambis Research Limited Peterhouse Technology Park, 100 Fulbourn Road Cambridge CB1 9PT / GB | 03 /
STEPHENS, Jonathan Clive, Acambis Research Limited Peterhouse Technology Park, 100 Fulbourn Road Cambridge CB1 9PT / GB | 04 /
BEAVIS, Juliet Claire, Acambis Research Limited Peterhouse Technology Park, 100 Fulbourn Road Cambridge CB1 9PT / GB | 05 /
DARSLEY, Michael James, Acambis Research Limited Peterhouse Technology Park, 100 Fulbourn Road Cambridge CB1 9PT / GB | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/30] | Tolfree, Roger Keith Tolfree Patents and Trademarks, Toll Drove Manea, Cambridgeshire PE15 0JX / GB | ||
Former [2004/24] | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02755355.1 | 11.09.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002GB04123 | Priority number, date | GB20010021998 | 11.09.2001 Original published format: GB 0121998 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03022306 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1425037 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1425037 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/108 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
C12N15/70 (EP,US);
A61K39/0258 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/245 (EP,US);
A61K2039/521 (EP,US);
A61K2039/522 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAKTERIELLER IMPFSTOFF | [2004/24] | English: | BACTERIAL VACCINE | [2004/24] | French: | VACCIN BACTERIEN | [2004/24] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 28.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.08.2006
13.09.2006
ADMISSIBLE SBL Vaccin AB Lundagatan 2 105 21 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Verhage, Richard Abraham, et al, et al Janssen Vaccines & Prevention B.V. Archimedesweg 4-6 2333 CN Leiden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.08.2006
13.09.2006
ADMISSIBLE SBL Vaccin AB Lundagatan 2 105 21 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Verhage, Richard Abraham, et al, et al Crucell Holland B.V. Archimedesweg 4-6 2333 CN Leiden / NL | ||
Former [2006/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.08.2006
SBL VACCIN AB Lundagatan 2 105 21 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Nilsson, Brita Linnea Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | 13.09.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.05.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.01.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 08.02.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 09.11.2005 | CY | 09.11.2005 | CZ | 09.11.2005 | EE | 09.11.2005 | LI | 09.11.2005 | SK | 09.11.2005 | TR | 09.11.2005 | BG | 09.02.2006 | GR | 09.02.2006 | LU | 11.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2010/46] |
Former [2009/02] | CY | 09.11.2005 | |
CZ | 09.11.2005 | ||
EE | 09.11.2005 | ||
SK | 09.11.2005 | ||
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
BG | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
LU | 11.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 09.11.2005 | |
EE | 09.11.2005 | ||
SK | 09.11.2005 | ||
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
BG | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
LU | 11.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 09.11.2005 | |
EE | 09.11.2005 | ||
SK | 09.11.2005 | ||
BG | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 09.11.2005 | |
SK | 09.11.2005 | ||
BG | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CZ | 09.11.2005 | |
IT | 09.11.2005 | ||
SK | 09.11.2005 | ||
BG | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/41] | CZ | 09.11.2005 | |
SK | 09.11.2005 | ||
BG | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | CZ | 09.11.2005 | |
SK | 09.11.2005 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CZ | 09.11.2005 | |
SK | 09.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9214487 (HOLMGREN JAN [SE], et al); | [X]WO9949026 (PEPTIDE THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO0037106 (SBL VACCIN AB [SE], et al); |