EP1483222 - COMPONENTS WITH BEARING OR WEAR-RESISTANT SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Element Six Limited Isle of Man Freeport, Ballasalla Isle of Man IM99 6AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Element Six Limited Isle of Man Freeport, Ballasalla Isle of Man IM99 6AQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCLYMONT Mark, Robin 1 Huson Road, Warfield Berkshire RG42 2QX / GB | 02 /
WORT, Christopher, John, Howard 61 Upthorpe Drive Wantage, Oxfordshire OX12 7DG / GB | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02755407.0 | 02.08.2002 | [2004/50] | WO2002IB03000 | Priority number, date | GB20010020037 | 16.08.2001 Original published format: GB 0120037 | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03016240 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1483222 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/87 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
A61F2/30767 (EP,US);
A61L27/303 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/5002 (EP,US);
C04B41/85 (EP,US);
C23C16/27 (EP,US);
C23C16/56 (EP,US);
F16C11/0604 (EP,US);
F16C11/0628 (EP,US);
F16C33/32 (EP,US);
A61F2/3094 (EP,US);
A61F2/32 (EP,US);
A61F2/34 (EP,US);
A61F2/36 (EP,US);
A61F2/3662 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30685 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3085 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30929 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30934 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3611 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3631 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00017 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00281 (EP,US);
A61F2310/0058 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00742 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00353 (EP,US);
C04B2237/72 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/565 (US,EP);
C04B41/5002, C04B41/4531, C04B41/457 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/50] | Title | German: | KOMPONENTEN MIT EINEM LAGER ODER ABRIEBSBESTÄNDIGEN OBERFLÄCHEN | [2004/50] | English: | COMPONENTS WITH BEARING OR WEAR-RESISTANT SURFACES | [2004/50] | French: | COMPOSANTES AVEC SURFACES D'APPUI OU ANTI-USURE | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 22.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/12] | 03.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/12] | Request for further processing for: | 16.01.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 16.01.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.03.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5593719 (DEARNALEY GEOFFREY [US], et al) [X] 1 * example 2; claims 10,11,19,24,25,30 *; | [XD]EP0540366 (DE BEERS IND DIAMOND [ZA]) [XD] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1-14 * |