EP1415345 - MULTICHIP LED PACKAGE WITH IN-PACKAGE QUANTITATIVE AND SPECTRAL SENSING CAPABILITY AND DIGITAL SIGNAL OUTPUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2014/17] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUNING, Gert, W. Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/26] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/19] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02755430.2 | 23.07.2002 | [2004/19] | WO2002IB03146 | Priority number, date | US20010915700 | 26.07.2001 Original published format: US 915700 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03010830 | Date: | 06.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1415345 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1415345 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/075, H01L25/16, H05B33/08 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
H01L25/167 (EP,US);
H05B45/22 (EP,US);
H05B45/40 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/19] | H01L25/075 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/19] | Title | German: | TRÄGERPACKUNG FÜR MEHRERE LED CHIPS MIT QUANTITATIVER UND SPEKTRALER ERFASSUNGSFÄHIGKEIT UND DIGITALER SIGNALAUSGABE | [2004/19] | English: | MULTICHIP LED PACKAGE WITH IN-PACKAGE QUANTITATIVE AND SPECTRAL SENSING CAPABILITY AND DIGITAL SIGNAL OUTPUT | [2004/19] | French: | BOITIER DEL MULTIPUCES A CAPACITE DE DETECTION QUANTITATIVE ET SPECTRALE INTEGREE ET SORTIE DE SIGNAL NUMERIQUE | [2004/19] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.04.2014 | BE | 23.04.2014 | CY | 23.04.2014 | CZ | 23.04.2014 | DK | 23.04.2014 | EE | 23.04.2014 | FI | 23.04.2014 | MC | 23.04.2014 | NL | 23.04.2014 | SE | 23.04.2014 | SK | 23.04.2014 | TR | 23.04.2014 | BG | 23.07.2014 | IE | 23.07.2014 | LU | 23.07.2014 | GR | 24.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | PT | 25.08.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/21] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 23.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4810937 (HAVEL KAREL [CA]) [X] 1,2,7-9,13 * column 2, lines 16-68; figures 1,2,5,6; claims 1,2 * * column 5, line 15 - column 6, line 26 *; | [A]US5724062 (HUNTER C ERIC [US]); | [AD]US5803579 (TURNBULL ROBERT R [US], et al); | [XA]US5836676 (ANDO AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9,13 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 44; figures 1-3,6,7,13; claims 4,5 * [A] 4,11; | [X]WO0057490 (EUROLIGHT ILLUMINATION TECHNOL [CH], et al) [X] 1,3,7,8,10,13 * page 2, line 20 - page 5, line 31; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE19931689 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) [A] 1,7,8,13 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1110739 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9,11,12 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0066]; figures 3,4,10-14 *; | [A]WO0147039 (LUMILEDS LIGHTING LLC [US]) [A] 1,2,7-9,13 * page 4, lines 93-106; figures 6B,7,10B,12B,15,17A,18 * * page 10, line 287 - page 11, line 309 * * page 17, line 505 - page 18, line 526 * * page 19, line 551 - page 20, line 590 * |