EP1421636 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A LITHIUM BATTERY, A LITHIUM BATTERY AND AN ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEIL, Hans Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
NOTTEN, Petrus, H., L. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
DE JONGH, Petra, E. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | van Wermeskerken, Stephanie Christine, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | van Wermeskerken, Stephanie Christine, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02755470.8 | 02.08.2002 | [2004/22] | WO2002IB03239 | Priority number, date | EP20010203185 | 24.08.2001 Original published format: EP 01203185 | EP20020075719 | 22.02.2002 Original published format: EP 02075719 | [2004/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03019698 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1421636 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/02 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/0413 (EP,US);
H01M10/0468 (EP,US);
H01M10/0585 (EP,US);
H01M4/043 (EP,US);
H01M10/0565 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP);
Y10T29/49108 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LITHIUM BATTERIE, LITHIUM BATTERIE UND ELEKTRISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2004/22] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A LITHIUM BATTERY, A LITHIUM BATTERY AND AN ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE | [2004/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE BATTERIE AU LITHIUM, BATTERIE AU LITHIUM ET APPAREIL ELECTRIQUE | [2004/22] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 30.11.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH11307130 ; | [X]JPH06181069 ; | [PX]JP2002170538 ; | [A]JPH04175725 ; | [A]JPS58197655 ; | [A]US5644207 (LEW ARK L [US], et al) [A] 1,13,16,17 * column 4, line 2 - column 5, line 29 * * column 8, lines 12-26; claims 1-20 *; | [X]WO9738453 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,13,16 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 30; claims 1-13 *; | [X]EP0928035 (VOLTEC PTE LTD [SG]) [X] 1-3,5,13-15 * page 3, lines 5-16 * * page 4, lines 2-41; claims 1-3 *; | [A]WO0004601 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1,6 * page 2, line 29 - page 4, line 26; claims 1-11 *; | [PX]WO0182393 (POLYSTOR CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-3,5,8-17 * page 2, line 2 - page 3, line 28 * * page 9, line 3 - page 14, line 25 * * page 17, line 12 - page 20, line 29; claims 1-50 *; | [E]EP1244169 (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1,2,5 * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 32; claims 9-13 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11307130 A 19991105 (TOSHIBA BATTERY CO LTD) [X] 1,13-15 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940929), vol. 018, no. 518, Database accession no. (E - 1612), & JP06181069 A 19940628 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021010), vol. 2002, no. 10, & JP2002170538 A 20020614 (SONY CORP) [PX] 1,13-16 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921009), vol. 016, no. 489, Database accession no. (P - 1433), & JP04175725 A 19920623 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,2,8-10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840221), vol. 008, no. 039, Database accession no. (E - 228), & JP58197655 A 19831117 (TOMOYUKI AOKI) [A] 1,13 * abstract * |