EP1406504 - IMITATION CHEESE COMPOSITIONS FOR USE IN THE MANUFACTURE OF CHEESE LOAVES, SLICES, AND THE LIKE, AND METHOD OF PRODUCING SUCH COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AFP Advanced Food Products LLC 402 South Custer Avenue New Holland, PA 17557 / US | [2016/44] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states AFP Advanced Food Products LLC 402 South Custer Avenue New Holland, PA 17557 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBSON, Michael, R. N7583 110th Street Spring Valley, WI 54767-8704 / US | 02 /
SCHALOW, Stephan, M. 61 Apricot Avenue Leola, PA 17540 / US | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Wilkinson, Stephen John, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [2016/44] |
Former [2010/03] | Gaunt, Robert John, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1, Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BG / GB | ||
Former [2004/16] | Gaunt, Robert John, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02756325.3 | 25.06.2002 | [2004/16] | WO2002US20384 | Priority number, date | US20010888720 | 25.06.2001 Original published format: US 888720 | US20020183859 | 25.06.2002 Original published format: US 183859 | [2016/44] |
Former [2004/16] | US20010888720 | 25.06.2001 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03000062 | Date: | 03.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1406504 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1406504 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A23C19/00, A23C20/02, A23C19/08, A23C19/09, A23C20/00 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
A23C20/02 (EP,US);
A23L11/45 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/194, A23V2250/50364, A23V2250/5108, A23V2250/5114, A23V2250/5024, A23V2250/5072 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/16] | A23C19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/44] |
Former [2004/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | LT | 27.12.2003 | LV | 27.12.2003 | SI | 27.12.2003 | Title | German: | KÄSEIMITAT-PRODUKTE FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON KÄSEHALTIGEN BROTLAIBEN, SCHNITTEN UND DERGLEICHEN, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SOLCHEN PRODUKTEN | [2004/16] | English: | IMITATION CHEESE COMPOSITIONS FOR USE IN THE MANUFACTURE OF CHEESE LOAVES, SLICES, AND THE LIKE, AND METHOD OF PRODUCING SUCH COMPOSITIONS | [2004/16] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE FROMAGE D'IMITATION DESTINEES A ETRE UTILISEES DANS LA FABRICATION DE PAINS DE FROMAGE, TRANCHES DE FROMAGE ET SIMILAIRES, AINSI QUE PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE TELLES COMPOSITIONS | [2004/16] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 07.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2006 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.11.2016 | FI | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | TR | 02.11.2016 | GR | 03.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | CY | 02.11.2016 | |
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 02.11.2016 | |
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/30] | FI | 02.11.2016 | |
GR | 03.02.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1575816 (KAY CANTRELL KITCHENS LTD) [Y] 1-33 * example XI *; | [Y]US4303691 (SAND RALPH E, et al) [Y] 1-33 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 16; column 2, lines 26-49; claims 1-12 *; | [Y]US5612073 (GAMAY ALY [US]) [Y] 1-33* column 2, lines 36-59; example 1; claims 1-7 *; | [Y]US5807601 (CARPENTER ROBERT N [US], et al) [Y] 1-33 * example 1; claims 23-35 * | International search | [Y]US4143175 (WHELAN RICHARD H, et al); | [Y]US4684533 (KRATOCHVIL JOHN F [US]) | by applicant | US4303691 | US5612073 | US5807601 |