EP1407179 - SINGLE-HANDED CORD/CABLE MANAGEMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states . Engineering, Inc. 115 Elliot Place Edgewater, MD 21037 / US | [2004/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIVERA, Alexander, F. 129 Oakford Avenue Edgewater, MD 21037 / US | [2004/45] |
Former [2004/16] | 01 /
RIVERA, Alexander, F. 115 Elliot Place Edgewater, MD 21037 / US | Representative(s) | Cardwell, Stuart Martin, et al Roystons Tower Building Water Street Liverpool, L3 1BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | Cardwell, Stuart Martin, et al Roystons, Tower Building, Water Street Liverpool, L3 1BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02756479.8 | 15.07.2002 | [2004/16] | WO2002US22355 | Priority number, date | US20010907016 | 17.07.2001 Original published format: US 907016 | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03025445 | Date: | 27.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1407179 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/12, B42F1/02 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
H01L21/67023 (EP,US);
F16L3/08 (EP,US);
F16L3/2332 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1498 (EP,US);
Y10T24/15 (EP,US);
Y10T24/44769 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINHÄNDIG BEDIENBARE SEIL/KABEL-ANORDNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2004/16] | English: | SINGLE-HANDED CORD/CABLE MANAGEMENT DEVICE | [2004/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GESTION DE CORDONS/CABLES D'UNE SEULE MAIN | [2004/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 25.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 06.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US3571861 (OLSON EARLE L); | [A]US4674720 (FETSCH RUDOLF [DE]); | [A]US4881301 (SWEENEY DENNIS R [US], et al); | [A]US4958791 (NAKAMURA TOSHINOBU [JP]); | [Y]US5079802 (BLASE MICHAEL R [US], et al); | [X]US5414911 (ADAMS WILLIAM E [US]); | [X]US5423501 (YU MICHAEL [US]); | [X]US5533696 (LAUGHLIN RAYMOND S [US], et al); | [Y]US5625931 (VISSER STEVEN C [US], et al) |