EP1438461 - ENERGY ABSORPTION APPARATUS WITH COLLAPSIBLE MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barrier Systems, Inc. 180 River Road Rio Vista, CA 94571 / US | [2004/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANGHILERI, Marco Via Zurett, 47 I-20125 Milano / IT | 02 /
MULLER, Franz, M. Via Scheiwiller, 1 I-20133 Milano / IT | 03 /
DENMAN, Owen, S. 8311 Dressage Way Sacramento, CA 95829 / US | [2004/30] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/30] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02756603.3 | 23.07.2002 | [2004/30] | WO2002US23389 | Priority number, date | US20010961584 | 24.09.2001 Original published format: US 961584 | [2004/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03027531 | Date: | 03.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1438461 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1438461 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E01F15/14 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
E01F15/146 (EP,US);
E01F15/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2004/44] | E01F13/00, E01F15/04 | ||
Former IPC [2004/30] | E01F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/30] | Title | German: | ENERGIEAUFNAHMEVORRICHTUNG MIT ZUSAMMENKLAPPBAREN MODULEN | [2004/30] | English: | ENERGY ABSORPTION APPARATUS WITH COLLAPSIBLE MODULES | [2004/30] | French: | APPAREIL D'ABSORPTION D'ENERGIE DOTE DE MODULES PLIABLES | [2004/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 04.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2005 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 08.08.2012 | CY | 08.08.2012 | CZ | 08.08.2012 | DK | 08.08.2012 | EE | 08.08.2012 | FI | 08.08.2012 | MC | 08.08.2012 | NL | 08.08.2012 | SE | 08.08.2012 | SK | 08.08.2012 | TR | 08.08.2012 | BG | 08.11.2012 | GR | 09.11.2012 | ES | 19.11.2012 | PT | 10.12.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/14] | BE | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | BE | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | BE | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | BE | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | BE | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 08.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4352484 (GERTZ DAVID C, et al) [Y] 9,23* the whole document *; | [XY]US4674911 (GERTZ DAVID C [US]) [X] 1-8,10-22,24-28 * the whole document * [Y] 9,23 | International search | [X]US4674911 (GERTZ DAVID C [US]); | [Y]US6116805 (GERTZ DAVID C [US]); | [Y]US5192157 (LATURNER JOHN F [US]); | [Y]US5011326 (CARNEY III JOHN F [US]); | [Y]US4645375 (CARNEY III JOHN F [US]); | [Y]US4321989 (MEINZER LESTER N); | [Y]US4934661 (DENMAN OWEN S [US], et al); | [Y]US4688766 (ZUCKER STANLEY [US]) |