EP1554572 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING BLOOD-BRAIN BARRIER TRANSPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raptor Pharmaceutical, Inc. 9 Commercial Boulevard, Suite 200 Novato CA 94949 / US | [2010/01] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Raptor Pharmaceutical Inc. P.O. Box 226 Sonoma, CA 95476 / US | ||
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states BioMarin Pharmaceutical Inc. 371 Bel Marin Keys Boulevard, Suite 210 Novato, CA 94949 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELIVEAU, Richard 266 Wilson Ile Des Soeurs, Québec / CA | 02 /
DEMEULE, Michel 343 Preston Beaconsfield, Quebec H9W 1Z2 / CA | 03 /
YANG, Joseph 11642 Summit Cresc. North Delta, British Columbia V4E 2Z5 / CA | 04 /
KENNARD, Malcolm, L. 2396 Caledonia Ave. North Vancouver, British Columbia V7G 1T9 / CA | 05 /
GABATHULER, Reinhardt 97 Rose Street San Rafael California 94901 / US | [2009/39] |
Former [2005/29] | 01 /
BELIVEAU, Richard 266 Wilson Ile Des Soeurs, Québec / CA | ||
02 /
DEMEULE, Michel MOntreal, Quebec / CA | |||
03 /
YANG, Joseph 11642 Summit Cresc. North Delta, British Columbia V4E 2Z5 / CA | |||
04 /
KENNARD, Malcolm, L. 2396 Caledonia Ave. North Vancouver, British Columbia V7G 1T / CA | |||
05 /
GABATHULER, Reinhardt 97 Rose Street San Rafael California 94901 / US | Representative(s) | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2006/31] | Richards, William John, et al D Young & Co, 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2005/29] | Richards, William John D Young & Co, 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02756731.2 | 25.07.2002 | [2005/29] | WO2002US23923 | Priority number, date | US20010308002P | 25.07.2001 Original published format: US 308002 P | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03009815 | Date: | 06.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1554572 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1554572 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, G01N33/567 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
A61K38/40 (EP,US);
A61K38/177 (EP,US);
A61K47/644 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/29] | G01N33/50, G01N33/566, G01N33/567 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/29] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR MODULATION DES TRANSPORTS DURCH DIE BLUT-HIRN-SCHRANKE | [2005/29] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING BLOOD-BRAIN BARRIER TRANSPORT | [2005/29] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES DE MODULATION DU TRANSPORT A TRAVERS LA BARRIERE HEMATHO-ENCEPHALIQUE | [2005/29] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 24.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.12.2003 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 15.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.10.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09012753.1 / EP2147679 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.10.2009 | BE | 14.10.2009 | CY | 14.10.2009 | CZ | 14.10.2009 | DK | 14.10.2009 | EE | 14.10.2009 | FI | 14.10.2009 | IT | 14.10.2009 | NL | 14.10.2009 | SE | 14.10.2009 | SK | 14.10.2009 | TR | 14.10.2009 | BG | 14.01.2010 | GR | 15.01.2010 | ES | 25.01.2010 | PT | 15.02.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
NL | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 14.10.2009 | |
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 25.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5981194 (JEFFERIES WILFRED A [CA], et al) [X] 1-6,20-22 * column 8, line 13 - line 30 * * column 8, line 54 - line 67 * * column 14, line 16 - line 20 * * column 25, line 59 - column 26, line 47 * * column 30, line 36 - line 48 ** column 31, line 11 - line 14 * | International search | [X]US5981194 (JEFFERIES WILFRED A [CA], et al); | [XP]WO0159459 (UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA], et al); | [XE]US6455494 (JEFFERIES WILFRED A [CA], et al); | [XP] - "Biotech Week", (20020619), pages 1 - 3, XP002997368 | [Y] - QIAN Z.M. ET AL, "Expression of iron transport proteins and excessive iron accumulation in the brain in neurodegenerative disorders", BRAIN RESEARCH REVIEWS, (1998), vol. 27, no. 3, pages 257 - 267, XP001031265 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-0173(98)00012-5 | [Y] - FILLEBEEN C. ET AL, "Receptor-mediated transcytosis of lactoferrin through the blood-brain barrier", J BIOL CHEM, (19990312), vol. 274, no. 11, pages 7011 - 7017, XP002997362 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.11.7011 | [Y] - SHIBATA M. ET AL, "Clearance of Alzheimer's amyloid-beta1-40 peptide from brain by LDL receptor-related protein-1 at the blood-brain barrier", J CLIN INVEST, (200012), vol. 106, no. 12, pages 1489 - 1499, XP001077700 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI10498 | [Y] - SCHULLEK J.R., "A high density screening format for encoded combinatorial libraries: assay miniturization and its application enzymatic reactions", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (19970301), vol. 246, no. 1, pages 20 - 29, XP002997363 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1996.9958 | by applicant | US3668210 | US3880834 | US3928356 | US3939152 | US3968125 | US3994898 | US4012448 | US4013672 | US4018895 | US4018779 | US4020072 | US4029661 | US4031226 | US4056673 | US4062858 | US4128717 | US4147798 | US4148796 | US4150231 | US4188388 | US4194009 | US4214089 | US4231930 | US4246411 | US4264499 | US4267328 | US4277476 | US4283394 | US4294763 | US4294828 | US4314081 | US4313896 | US4324787 | US4358451 | US4383994 | US4391982 | US4397853 | US4399283 | US4424202 | US4427694 | US4440781 | US4443451 | US4459306 | US4474804 | US4490540 | US4520026 | US4522949 | US4524151 | US4525479 | US4529727 | US4532327 | US4541956 | US4542160 | US4544501 | US4548938 | US4550187 | US4550186 | US4560684 | US4590180 | US4611066 | US4613600 | US4617314 | US4618685 | US4631285 | US4645773 | US4647585 | US4647573 | US4649139 | US4650874 | US4650797 | US4652578 | US4652576 | US4654357 | US4654356 | US4654355 | US4654335 | US4656267 | US4656185 | US4661506 | US4663337 | US4663336 | US4668787 | US4670560 | US4670453 | US4681970 | US4681882 | US4684747 | US4690930 | US4703120 | US4704382 | US4707550 | US4721796 | US4727072 | US4730052 | US4734426 | US4734425 | US4734424 | US4735962 | US4738978 | US4749715 | US4752616 | US4753951 | US4753946 | US4762837 | US4767756 | US4769371 | US4771047 | US4774239 | US4775757 | US4778800 | US4780538 | US4785085 | US4788188 | US4824955 | US4824831 | US4833145 | US4835157 | US4845216 | US4847379 | US4849563 | US4853391 | US4863955 | US4871746 | US4874760 | US4882334 | US4882333 | US4883872 | US4883811 | US4886790 | US4888335 | US4889859 | US4889866 | US4892887 | US4904663 | US4906634 | US4927828 | US4939137 | US4952692 | US4954526 | US4959383 | US4962114 | US4966967 | US4968800 | US4970318 | US4971984 | US4977167 | US4977144 | US4981843 | US4996229 | US4996206 | US5006542 | US5011931 | US5019390 | US5026712 | US5036070 | US5036065 | US5051423 | US5055466 | US5061813 | US5066493 | US5070099 | US5071848 | US5077404 | US5079247 | US5101072 | US5106996 | US5109024 | US5116861 | US5120733 | US5128349 | US5140031 | US5185362 | US5189036 | US5192799 | US5196424 | US5198449 | US5202330 | US5208245 | US5214068 | US5217958 | US5223503 | US5223516 | US5256664 | US5260444 | US5310731 | US5318965 | US5332737 | US5358952 | US5362902 | US5387593 | US5387586 | US5389675 | US5393771 | US5401758 | US5414017 | US5414013 | US5457118 | US5461062 | US5463181 | US5478828 | US5482925 | US5508277 | US5512678 | US5525633 | US5525606 | US5530026 | US5547966 | US5552411 | US5552397 | US5559410 | US5563170 | US5574037 | US5576220 | US5597831 | US5610292 | US5612370 | US5612323 | US5618813 | US5624924 | US5631251 | US5637586 | US5646276 | US5654484 | US5654294 | US5661129 | US5665715 | US5679672 | US5684004 | US5686482 | US5691332 | US5696111 | US5698529 | US5705523 | US5723457 | US5726171 | US5731322 | US5753668 | US5760041 | US5786344 | US5807889 | US5837702 | US5859239 | US5869478 | US5877206 | US5880161 | US5981194 | US2001025026 | US19420002262 | US19540002262 |