EP1461708 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GROUP VIDEO TELECONFERENCING WITH VARIABLE BANDWIDTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reality Fusion, Inc. 603 Mission Street Santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US | [2004/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPENCER, Percy, LeBaron 503 Van Ness Avenue santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US | 02 /
WEYZEN, Petrus, Hubertus 230-C Pilkington Avenue Santa Cruz, CA 95062 / US | 03 /
EGENBERGER, Jeremy 1444 Warfield Avenue Modesto, California 95350 / US | 04 /
FOSSGREEN, Don 494 Lockwood Lane Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US | [2004/44] |
Former [2004/40] | 01 /
SPENCER, Percy, LeBaron 503 Van Ness Avenue santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US | ||
02 /
WEYZEN, Petrus, Hubertus 230-C Pilkington Avenue Santa Cruz, CA 95062 / US | |||
03 /
EGENBERGER, Jeremy / US | |||
04 /
FOSSGREEN, Don 494 Lockwood Lane Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US | Representative(s) | Turner, James Arthur D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Turner, James Arthur D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02757358.3 | 26.08.2002 | [2004/40] | WO2002US26962 | Priority number, date | US20010938721 | 24.08.2001 Original published format: US 938721 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03019390 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1461708 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/00, G06F15/16, H04N7/12, H04J3/00, H04J3/22 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
H04L65/80 (EP);
H04L12/1827 (EP);
H04L43/0864 (EP);
H04L47/10 (EP);
H04L47/11 (EP);
H04L47/2416 (EP);
H04L47/263 (EP);
H04L47/283 (EP);
H04L47/365 (EP);
H04L65/4038 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR GRUPPEN-VIDEOTELEKONFERENZEN MIT VARIABLER BANDBREITE | [2004/40] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GROUP VIDEO TELECONFERENCING WITH VARIABLE BANDWIDTH | [2004/40] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR VIDEOCONFERENCE DE GROUPE AVEC LARGEUR DE BANDE VARIABLE | [2004/40] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 01.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/37] | 23.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.05.2004 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | BG   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | CY   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | CZ   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | DK   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | EE   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | ES   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | FI   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | GR   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | IE   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | MC   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | PT   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | SK   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | 03.05.2004 | TR   M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.05.2004 | M02   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5983263 (ROTHROCK LEWIS V [US], et al); | [Y]US6085252 (ZHU QIN-FAN [US], et al); | [Y]US6118817 (WANG ALBERT S [US]); | [A]US6229820 (KANEMAKI HIDEYASU [JP], et al); | [A]US6278693 (ALDRED BARRY KEITH [GB], et al) |