24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
11.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
11.07.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
13.06.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.07.2014 [2014/29] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
28.03.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
02.08.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
31.07.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
31.07.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.04.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.04.2013 |
Change - inventor |
published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
15.03.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] |
15.03.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] |
15.03.2013 |
Change - French title |
published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] |
08.03.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |
08.03.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |
17.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.08.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.06.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.03.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.01.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.09.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.07.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.05.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.05.2011 |
Change: Reply to examination report |
|
04.05.2011 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
04.05.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.05.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.04.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.12.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.08.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.06.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.02.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.01.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.09.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.07.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.05.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.01.2008 |
First examination report |
|
22.09.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.04.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
21.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.07.2006 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 30.08.2006 [2006/35] |
22.09.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.11.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
22.11.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
22.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.05.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] |
21.05.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] |
18.05.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.04.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.04.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.04.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.04.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|