EP1434793 - RECOMBINANT ALLERGEN WITH REDUCED IgE BINDING BUT UNDIMINISHED T-CELL ANTIGENICITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Melbourne Grattan Street Parkville, Victoria 3052 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states The University of Melbourne Grattan Street Parkville Victoria 3052 / AU | ||
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF MELBOURNE Grattan Street Parkville, Victoria 3052 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEWEERD, Nicole 122 Kananook Avenue Seaford Victoria 3198 / AU | 02 /
SINGH, Mohan Bir 7 Lloyd Court Templestowe, Victoria 3106 / AU | 03 /
BHALLA, Prem L. 7 Lloyd Court Templestowe, Victoria 3106 / AU | 04 /
SWOBODA, Ines F G Woldmullerstr 43 A-9020 Klagenfurt / AT | [2013/20] |
Former [2004/28] | 01 /
DEWEERD Nicole 122 Kananook Avenue Seaford Victoria 3198 / AU | ||
02 /
SINGH, Mohan, Bir 7 Lloyd Court Templestowe, Victoria 3106 / AU | |||
03 /
BHALLA, Prem, L. 7 Lloyd Court Templestowe, Victoria 3106 / AU | |||
04 /
SWOBODA, Ines F G Woldmullerstr 43 A-9020 Klagenfurt / AT | Representative(s) | Seemann, Joachim Merck KGaA Patents Healthcare Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Seemann, Joachim Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2007/22] | Seemann, Joachim Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Str. 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2004/28] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. Gray's Inn 14 South Square London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02757980.4 | 13.09.2002 | [2004/28] | WO2002AU01261 | Priority number, date | AU2001PR07792 | 20.09.2001 Original published format: AU PR779201 | [2004/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03025009 | Date: | 27.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1434793 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1434793 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 27.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/36, C07K14/415, C07K16/16 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
C07K16/16 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/415 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/36 (EP,US);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2013/15] | A61K39/36, C07K14/415 | ||
Former IPC [2004/28] | C07K14/415, C12N15/13, A61K39/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/28] | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTES ALLERGEN MIT REDUZIERTER IgE-BINDUNG, JEDOCH UNVERMINDERTER T-ZELLEN-ANTIGENITÄT | [2004/28] | English: | RECOMBINANT ALLERGEN WITH REDUCED IgE BINDING BUT UNDIMINISHED T-CELL ANTIGENICITY | [2004/28] | French: | ALLERGEN RECOMBINANT PRESENTANT UNE FIXATION LIMITEE A IgE MAIS UNE ANTIGENICITE ILLIMITEE AUX LYMPHOCYTES T | [2013/16] |
Former [2004/28] | ALLERGENE DE RECOMBINAISON PRESENTANT UNE FIXATION LIMITEE A IgE MAIS UNE ANTIGENICITE ILLIMITEE AUX LYMPHOCYTES T | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 08.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 14.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.09.2013 | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | CZ | 04.09.2013 | DK | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | FI | 04.09.2013 | MC | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | IE | 13.09.2013 | LU | 13.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/41] | BE | 04.09.2013 | |
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
IE | 13.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | BE | 04.09.2013 | |
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
IE | 13.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/29] | BE | 04.09.2013 | |
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 04.09.2013 | |
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 04.09.2013 | |
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 03.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9506728 (IMMULOGIC PHARMA CORP [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [XY] - SWOBODA I ET AL, "HYPOALLERGENIC FORMS OF THE RYEGRASS POLLEN ALLERGEN LOL P 5 AS CANDIDATES FOR IMMUNOTHERAPY", INTERNATIONAL ARCHIVES OF ALLERGY AND IMMUNOLOGY, (200101), vol. 124, no. 1-3, ISSN 1018-2438, pages 380 - 382, XP009011304 [X] 1-6,8-14 * the whole document * [Y] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000053763 | [Y] - SUPHIOGLU CENK ET AL, "Molecular basis of IgE-recognition of Lol p 5, a major allergen of rye-grass pollen", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (199804), vol. 35, no. 5, ISSN 0161-5890, pages 293 - 305, XP002377122 [Y] 7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0161-5890(98)00050-9 | [DA] - ONG ENG KOK ET AL, "Cloning of a cDNA encoding a group-V (group-IX) allergen isoform from rye-grass pollen that demonstrates specific antigenic immunoreactivity", GENE (AMSTERDAM), (1993), vol. 134, no. 2, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 235 - 240, XP002377123 [DA] 7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(93)90099-O | [A] - BLAHER B ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF T-CELL EPITOPES OF LOL P 9, A MAJOR ALLERGEN OF RYEGRASS (LOLIUM PERENNC) POLLEN", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, MOSBY - YEARLY BOOK, INC, US, (199607), vol. 98, no. 1, ISSN 0091-6749, pages 124 - 132, XP009038240 [A] 7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0091-6749(96)70234-8 | [A] - BURTON M D ET AL, "T-cell receptor contact and MHC binding residues of a major rye grass pollen allgergen T-cell epitope", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, MOSBY - YEARLY BOOK, INC, US, (1999), vol. 103, no. 2, PART 1, ISSN 0091-6749, pages 255 - 261, XP002994069 [A] 7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0091-6749(99)70499-9 | [A] - LALLA DE C ET AL, "Cutting edge: identification of novel T cell epitopes in Lol p5a by computational prediction", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE WILLIAMS AND WILKINS CO. BALTIMORE, US, (19990815), vol. 163, no. 4, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 1725 - 1729, XP002300994 [A] 7 * the whole document * | [A] - ONG E K ET AL, "Mapping of the antigenic and allergenic epitopes of Lol p VB using gene fragmentation", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 32, no. 4, ISSN 0161-5890, pages 295 - 302, XP002377124 [A] 7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0161-5890(94)00127-M | [PX] - SWOBODA INES ET AL, "Mutants of the major ryegrass pollen allergen, Lol p 5, with reduced IgE-binding capacity: Candidates for grass pollen-specific immunotherapy", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (200201), vol. 32, no. 1, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 270 - 280, XP002377125 [PX] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-4141(200201)32:1<270::AID-IMMU270>3.0.CO;2-X | International search | [X] - SCHRAMM G. ET AL., "Allergen engineering: Variants of the timothy grass pollen allergen Ph1 p 5B with reduced IgE-binding capacity but not conserved T cell reactivity", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 162, pages 2406 - 2414, XP002216586 | [X] - MULLER W.D. ET AL., "T-zell epitope von allegnenen", ALLERGOLOGIE, (199908), vol. 22, no. 8, pages 455 - 459, XP008052524 | [X] - WIEDERMANN U. ET AL., "Mucosal tolerance induction with hypoallergenic molecules in a murine model of allergic asthma", INTERNATIONAL ARCHIVES OF ALLERGY AND IMMUNOLOGY, (2001), vol. 124, pages 391 - 394, XP002990423 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000053767 | [X] - BANNON G.A. ET AL., "Engineering, characterization and in vitro efficacy of the major peanut allergens for use in immunotherapy", INTERNATIONAL ARCHIVES OF ALLERGY AND IMMUNOLOGY, (2001), vol. 124, pages 70 - 72, XP002990422 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000053672 | [X] - AKDIS C.A. ET AL., "Regulation of specific immune responses by chemical and structural modifications of allergens", INTERNATIONAL ARCHIVES OF ALLERGY AND IMMUNOLOGY, (2000), vol. 121, pages 261 - 269, XP001016273 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000024352 | [X] - SON D.Y. ET AL., "Pollen-related food allergy: cloning and immunological analysis of isoforms and mutants of Mal d 1, the major apple allergen and Bet v 1, the major birch pollen allergen", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (1999), vol. 38, pages 201 - 215, XP002988494 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s003940050063 | [X] - KRAFT D. ET AL., "The importance of recombinant allergens for diagnosis and therapy of IgE-mediated allergies", INTERNATIONAL ARCHIVES OF ALLERGY AND IMMUNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 118, pages 171 - 176, XP002269826 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000024058 | [X] - LARCHE M. ET AL., "Allergen, IgE and mast-cell-directed therapies: an overview", PROGRESS IN RESPIRATORY RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 31, pages 182 - 185, XP008052550 | [X] - TAKAI T. ET AL., "Non-anaphylactic combination of partially deleted fragments of the major house dust mite allergen Der f for allergen-specific immunotherapy", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 36, pages 1055 - 1065, XP001024190 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0161-5890(99)00098-X | by applicant | WO9506728 | - BOND ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 91, page 339 | - SINGH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 1384 - 1388 | - ONG ET AL., GENE, (1993), vol. 134, pages 235 - 240 | - SWOBODA I. ET AL., INT. ARCH. ALLERG. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 134, pages 1018 - 2438 | - SUPHIOGLU C. ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 35, pages 293 - 305 | - BLAHER B. ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 98, pages 124 - 132 | - BURTON M. D. ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 103, pages 255 - 61 | - LALLA DE C. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 163, pages 1725 - 1729 | - ONG E. K. ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 32, pages 295 - 302 | - SWOBODA I. ET AL., EUROP. J. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 32, pages 270 - 280 | - SCHRAMM G. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 162, pages 2406 - 2414 | - MULLER W. D. ET AL., ALLERGOLOGIE, (1999), vol. 22, pages 455 - 459 | - WIEDERMANN U. ET AL., INT. ARCH. ALLERG. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 124, pages 391 - 394 | - BANNON G. A. ET AL., INT. ARCH. ALLERG. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 124, pages 70 - 72 | - AKDIS C. A. ET AL., INT. ARCH. ALLERG. IMMUNOL, (2000), vol. 121, pages 261 - 269 | - SON D. Y. ET AL., EUROP. J. NUTRIT, (1999), vol. 38, pages 201 - 215 | - KRAFT D. ET AL., INT. ARCH. ALLERG. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 118, pages 171 - 176 | - LARCHE M. ET AL., PROGR. RESPIRAT. RES., (2001), vol. 31, pages 182 - 185 | - TAKAI T. ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 36, pages 1055 - 1065 |