EP1427929 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING AT LEAST ONE TURBOCHARGER ON AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/11] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILD, Ernst Wernerstrasse 20/6 71739 Oberriexingen / DE | 02 /
WEGENER, Sabine Bruehlstrasse 16 71679 Asperg / DE | 03 /
HILD, Rainer Raitestrasse 40 71696 Moeglingen / DE | [2004/25] | Application number, filing date | 02758110.7 | 20.07.2002 | [2004/25] | WO2002DE02683 | Priority number, date | DE2001145038 | 13.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10145038 | [2004/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03027464 | Date: | 03.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1427929 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1427929 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02D23/00, F02B37/18, F02B37/013 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
F02D41/1448 (EP,US);
F02B37/04 (EP,US);
F02B37/18 (EP,US);
F02B39/10 (EP,US);
F02D23/00 (EP,US);
F02D41/0007 (EP,US);
F02D2041/141 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0406 (EP,US);
F02D41/1446 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [2007/11] |
Former [2004/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN WENIGSTENS EINES LADERS EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS | [2004/25] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING AT LEAST ONE TURBOCHARGER ON AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2004/25] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR ACTIONNER AU MOINS UN TURBOCOMPRESSEUR DE MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2004/25] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 20.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]DE19935901 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-8,13-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 53 - column 7, line 9 * [A] 4,10 [Y] 9,11,12; | [YA]DE19708721 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [Y] 9,11,12 * abstract * * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 53 * [A] 1-8,13-15; | [XA]US6058708 (HEINITZ DIRK [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,13-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 27 * [A] 3,4,8-12; | [A]DE19936269 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,8,13-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 31 - column 3, line 20 *; | [A]EP1070837 (STEYR NUTZFAHRZEUGE [AT]) [A] 1,2,9-15 * abstract * * column 3, paragraph 11 - column 5, line 16 * * column 6, line 21 - line 23 * | [XA] - ISERMANN R ET AL, "Modellgestützte Reglerentwicklung für einen Abgasturbolader mit variabler Turbinengeometrie an einem DI-Dieselmotor", MTZ MOTORTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, FRANCKH'SCHE VERLAGSHANDLUNG, ABTEILUNG TECHNIK. STUTTGART, DE, (200003), vol. 61, no. 3, ISSN 0024-8525, pages 184 - 193, XP000928799 [X] 1,13-15 * the whole document * [A] 2-12 | [A] - ZELLBECK HANS ET AL, "Die elektrisch unterstützte Abgasturboaufladung als neues Aufladekonzept", MTZ MOTORTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, FRANCKH'SCHE VERLAGSHANDLUNG, ABTEILUNG TECHNIK. STUTTGART, DE, (199906), vol. 60, no. 6, ISSN 0024-8525, pages 386 - 391, XP000833998 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - VANTINE KATIE J ET AL, "ANALYSIS OF AN EVENT-BASED DIESEL ENGINE MODEL FOR CONTROL PURPOSES", IFAC WORKSHOP ON ADVANCES IN AUTOMOTIVE CONTROL, XX, XX, (20010328), pages 361 - 366, XP001032737 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |