EP1417641 - CHIP-CARD WITH A PROJECTOR MIRROR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2004/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAACKMANN, Peter Schlierseestr. 11 81541 München / DE | 02 /
RUEPING, Stefan Hans-Maurer-Str. 5 84435 Lengdorf / DE | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2004/20] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02758370.7 | 19.07.2002 | [2004/20] | WO2002EP08089 | Priority number, date | DE2001139063 | 09.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10139063 | [2004/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03015022 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1417641 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1417641 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, G06K7/10 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
G06K19/077 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/50] |
Former [2004/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIPKARTE MIT EINEM PROJEKTIONSSPIEGEL | [2004/20] | English: | CHIP-CARD WITH A PROJECTOR MIRROR | [2004/20] | French: | CARTE A PUCE POURVUE D'UN MIROIR DE PROJECTION | [2004/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 07.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 08.12.2004 | ES | 19.03.2005 | [2007/39] |
Former [2006/12] | ES | 19.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4783598 (MCADAMS JR CHARLES K [US]) [X] 10,13,14 * column 3, line 34 - column 3, line 51 * [A] 1-9; | [XA]EP0498582 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 10,13-15,17 * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 26 * [A] 1-9; | [X]EP0508100 (ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 10,13,14,17 * column 2, line 7 - column 4, line 31 *; | [PX]EP1168231 (SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [PX] 1* column 17, line 6 - column 19, line 24 * |