Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7863320 | ![]() | 04.01.2011 | B2 | US2008070886 | 20.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | US79094304 | 02.03.2004 | GB0204025 | 03.09.2002 | US83066807 | 30.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7863321 | ![]() | 04.01.2011 | B2 | US2008070849 | 20.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | US79094304 | 02.03.2004 | GB0204025 | 03.09.2002 | US83067707 | 30.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7868040 | ![]() | 11.01.2011 | B2 | US2008070848 | 20.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | US83065907 | 30.07.2007 | US79094304 | 02.03.2004 | GB0204025 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7868039 | ![]() | 11.01.2011 | B2 | US2008070847 | 20.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | US83065007 | 30.07.2007 | US79094304 | 02.03.2004 | GB0204025 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007060637 | ![]() | 15.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | US59267806 | 03.11.2006 | US79094304 | 02.03.2004 | GB0204025 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7863322 | ![]() | 04.01.2011 | B2 | US2004204480 | 14.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | GB0204025 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005509599 | ![]() | 14.04.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | GB0204025 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2236134 | ![]() | 06.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06077049 | 03.09.2002 | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | EP02758562 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1759694 | ![]() | 18.02.2009 | A3 | EP1759694 | 07.03.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | EP02758562 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002324143B | ![]() | 13.09.2007 | B2 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | GB0204025 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1423105 | ![]() | 12.08.2009 | B9 | EP1423105 | 03.12.2008 | B1 | EP1423105 | 02.06.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | GB0204025 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0212258 | 19.10.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | GB0204025 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2458459 | 13.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | GB0204025 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1110426T | 29.04.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | EP02758562 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60230159D1 | 15.01.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | GB0204025 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1423105T | 30.03.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | GB0204025 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA008056 | 27.02.2007 | B1 | EA200400370 | 26.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | GB0204025 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IS7144 | 06.02.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | GB0204025 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04002004 | 17.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | GB0204025 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20040591L | 30.04.2004 | L | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | GB0204025 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ531045 | 31.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | GB0204025 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1423105T | 31.08.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | GB0204025 | 03.09.2002 | EP02758562 | 03.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03020259 | ![]() | 17.04.2003 | A3 | WO03020259 | 13.03.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010270124 | ![]() | 02.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009263371 | ![]() | 12.11.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE415963T | 15.12.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100536840C | 09.09.2009 | C | CN1708296 | 14.12.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101596186 | 09.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101596187 | 09.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101607087 | 23.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1994287 | 11.07.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA010857 | 30.12.2008 | B1 | EA200601118 | 29.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA200801611 | 30.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2321283T | 04.06.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0121285D0 | 24.10.2001 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ546573 | 31.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ554093 | 31.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ567456 | 28.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ576925 | 30.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1423105E | 09.03.2009 | E | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200401078 | 15.04.2005 | B | Priority number | Date | GB0121285 | 03.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | EP1759694 | EP2236134 |