EP1425534 - HOSE CLAMP ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steadman, William, David 2166 S.E. Pyramid Road Port Saint Lucie, FL 34952 / US | [2004/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Sales, Robert Reginald Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Sales, Robert Reginald Swindell & Pearson, 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02758579.3 | 09.09.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002GB04099 | Priority number, date | GB20010022191 | 14.09.2001 Original published format: GB 0122191 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03025448 | Date: | 27.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1425534 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1425534 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/04, B65D63/14 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
B65D63/08 (EP,US);
F16L33/04 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1441 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1443 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1459 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEMMSCHELLEN VORRICHTUNG | [2004/24] | English: | HOSE CLAMP ARRANGEMENT | [2004/24] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE COLLIER DE SERRAGE | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 11.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.04.2005 | BE | 06.04.2005 | CH | 06.04.2005 | CZ | 06.04.2005 | EE | 06.04.2005 | FI | 06.04.2005 | LI | 06.04.2005 | NL | 06.04.2005 | SK | 06.04.2005 | TR | 06.04.2005 | BG | 06.07.2005 | DK | 06.07.2005 | GR | 06.07.2005 | SE | 06.07.2005 | ES | 17.07.2005 | PT | 08.09.2005 | CY | 09.09.2005 | IE | 09.09.2005 | LU | 30.09.2005 | MC | 30.09.2005 | [2013/51] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2005 | ||
EE | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
SK | 06.04.2005 | ||
TR | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
CY | 09.09.2005 | ||
IE | 09.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2005 | ||
EE | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
SK | 06.04.2005 | ||
TR | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
IE | 09.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
SK | 06.04.2005 | ||
TR | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
IE | 09.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
SK | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
IE | 09.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
SK | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 06.04.2005 | |
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 06.07.2005 | Cited in | International search | [YA]GB430142 (HELGE ALFRED BORRESEN) [Y] 12,13 * figures 1-7 *[A] 1-11; | [XY]US3579754 (OETIKER HANS) [X] 1-8,10,11 * abstract * [Y] 9,12,13; | [Y]US5488760 (JANSEN GEORGE A [US]) [Y] 9 * column 5, line 31 - column 6, line 11; figures 2-4 * |