EP1485346 - NOVEL POSITIVELY CHARGED LIPIDS AND LIPOSOMES COMPRISING THE POSITIVELY CHARGED LIPIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yonsei University 134 Sinchon-dong, Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-749 / KR | [2008/41] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Yonsei University 134 Sinchon-dong, Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-749 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Yong Serk 103-602 Cheonggu Apt., Myeongryun 2-dong 220-042 Wonju, Kangwon-do / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hong Sung 75-6 Seobu-dong 760-090 Andong, Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR | 03 /
MOON, Jae Ho 35-705 Hanyang Apt., Apgujeong-dong Kangnam-gu, 135-110 Seoul / KR | 04 /
JANG, Doo Ok 104-1002 Cheonggu Apt., Myeongryun 2-dong 220-042 Wonju, Kangwon-do / KR | 05 /
HEO, Yeon 15/1 193-164 Eungbong-dong, Seongdong-gu 133-080 Seoul / KR | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Duckworth, Timothy John, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Duckworth, Timothy John, et al J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02758897.9 | 22.07.2002 | [2004/51] | WO2002KR01377 | Priority number, date | KR20020014923 | 20.03.2002 Original published format: KR 2002014923 | [2004/51] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03078383 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1485346 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1485346 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07C237/12, A61K9/127, C12N15/88 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
C12N15/88 (EP,US);
C07C231/10 (KR);
A61K9/1272 (EP,US);
C07K5/06086 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/51] | C07C237/12 | Designated contracting states | GB [2008/41] |
Former [2004/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | NEUE POSITIV GELADENE LIPIDE UND LIPOSOMEN, DIE DIE POSITIV GELADENEN LIPIDE ENTHALTEN | [2004/51] | English: | NOVEL POSITIVELY CHARGED LIPIDS AND LIPOSOMES COMPRISING THE POSITIVELY CHARGED LIPIDS | [2004/51] | French: | NOUVEAUX LIPIDES POSITIVEMENT CHARGES ET LIPOSOMES COMPRENANT CES LIPIDES POSITIVEMENT CHARGES | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2004 | Translation filed | 16.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 16.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 07.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Request for further processing for: | 29.05.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 29.05.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.06.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9503067 (KHAVINSON VLADIMIR KHATSKELEVI [RU], et al) [X] 1 * example 1 *; | [A]US5688771 (PENNEY CHRISTOPHER [CA], et al) [A] 1,2* example 16 *; | [X] - CIROUSSEL F ET AL, "PURIFICATION AND PROPERTIES OF AN LD-DIPEPTIDASE FROM BACILLUS SPHAERICUS", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, (1990), vol. 22, no. 5, ISSN 0020-711X, pages 525 - 532, XP008059686 [X] 1 * page 526, column 1, paragraphs 2,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0020-711X(90)90268-8 | [X] - MEGURO, HIROSHI ET AL, "Study on the Optical Rotatory Dispersion of Di-Peptides and its Application to the Recognition of Di-Peptides from Higher Peptides and Amino Acids", AGR BIOL CHEM, (1968), vol. 32, no. 4, pages 518 - 521, XP008060334 [X] 1 * page 518, column 1, line 18 - column 2, line 9; table 1 * | International search | [X]US4497801 (HASHIMOTO MASASHI [JP], et al); | [X]WO9503067 (KHAVINSON VLADIMIR KHATSKELEVI [RU], et al) | [X] - AKIO I. ET AL., "Lysyl-aspartic acid derivatives as model compounds of growth hormone to induce lipolysis", AGRICULTURAL BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1988), vol. 52, no. 3, pages 765 - 771, XP001161000 | [XP] - SETSUNA KINIO ET AL., "Studies on biologically active peptide derived from fish and shellfish. 4. Separation and identification of angiotensin 1-concerting enzyme inhibitory peptides from the protease hydrolyzate of undaria pinnatifida protein and their dipeptide derivatives", JOURNAL OF NATIONAL FISHERIES UNIVERSITY, (2002), vol. 50, no. 2, pages 61 - 66, XP008059791 | [X] - ICHIZO SHINDODA ET AL., "A new salty peptide, ornithyl-beta-alanine hydrochloride", PEPTIDE CHEMISTRY, 1983 21ST, (1984), pages 43 - 46, XP008059662 | [X] - CIROUSSEL FRANCOISE ET AL., "Purification and properties of and LD-dipeptidase from bacillus sphaericus", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (1990), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 525 - 532, XP008059686 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0020-711X(90)90268-8 |