EP1427272 - FORESTRY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/25] | FORESTRY MACHINE | ||
[2008/26] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2014 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gremo AB Box 44 310 61 Ätran / SE | [2010/27] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states Fiberpac KB Bäckakra 340 15 Vittaryd / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARLSSON, Jan Bäckakra 340 15 Vittaryd / SE | 02 /
LENNARTSSON, Christer Espetuna 340 30 Vislanda / SE | [2008/29] |
Former [2004/25] | 01 /
CARLSSON, Jan Bäck kra S-340 15 Vittaryd / SE | ||
02 /
LENNARTSSON, Christer Espetuna S-340 30 Vislanda / SE | Representative(s) | Rosenquist, Per Olof, et al Wallengren & Partners P.O. Box 116 331 21 Värnamo / SE | [2013/31] |
Former [2004/25] | Wallengren, Yngvar Patentbyran Y Wallengren AB Box 116 331 21 Värnamo / SE | Application number, filing date | 02759028.0 | 12.08.2002 | [2004/25] | WO2002SE01448 | Priority number, date | SE20010002772 | 21.08.2001 Original published format: SE 0102772 | [2004/25] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03015499 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1427272 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1427272 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01G23/08 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
A01G23/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 22.03.2004 | LV | 22.03.2004 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR DIE FORSTWIRTSCHAFT | [2008/26] | English: | FORESTRY SYSTEM | [2008/26] | French: | SYSTEME FORESTIER | [2008/26] |
Former [2004/25] | MASCHINE FÜR DIE FORSTWIRTSCHAFT | ||
Former [2004/25] | FORESTRY MACHINE | ||
Former [2004/25] | ENGIN FORESTIER | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2002 | Translation filed | 22.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 22.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 18.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.08.2009
ADMISSIBLE John Deere Forestry OY Lokomonkatu 21 33100 Tampere / FI Opponent's representative Rahkonen, Erkki Juhani, et al, et al Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Visiokatu 1 33720 Tampere / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.08.2009
ADMISSIBLE John Deere Forestry OY Lokomonkatu 21 33100 Tampere / FI Opponent's representative Rahkonen, Erkki Juhani, et al, et al Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Hermiankatu 1 B 33720 Tampere / FI | 30.09.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.02.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.10.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.12.2013 | 15.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 25.10.2013 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2014/08] | 12.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.11.2008 | BE | 26.11.2008 | CY | 26.11.2008 | CZ | 26.11.2008 | DK | 26.11.2008 | EE | 26.11.2008 | IT | 26.11.2008 | NL | 26.11.2008 | SK | 26.11.2008 | TR | 26.11.2008 | BG | 26.02.2009 | GR | 27.02.2009 | ES | 08.03.2009 | PT | 27.04.2009 | GB | 12.08.2009 | IE | 12.08.2009 | LU | 12.08.2009 | CH | 31.08.2009 | FR | 31.08.2009 | LI | 31.08.2009 | MC | 31.08.2009 | FI | 12.08.2012 | SE | 13.08.2012 | DE | 01.03.2013 | [2013/35] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
IT | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
GB | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
LU | 12.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
IT | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
GB | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
GB | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 08.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3536459 (HOHENLOHE WALDENBURG KG SPEZIA [DE]); | [A]WO8704128 (OESA AB [SE]); | [X]DE3628767 (DASSER MANFRED DIPL ING [DE]); | [A]US5366337 (ERIKSSON PETER [SE]); | [X]WO9608959 (TUOMINEN JUHANI [FI]) |