EP1432925 - HEAT SHIELD FOR A BRAKE PISTON AND BRAKE ACTUATOR INCORPORATING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safe Effect Pty Ltd Suite 3, 75 Erindale Road Balcatta Western Australia 6021 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states Safe Effect Pty Ltd Suite 3, 75 Erindale Road Balcatta, Western Australia, 6021 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOWAK, Stan Suite 3, 75 Erindale Road Balcatta, Western Australia 6021 / AU | 02 /
KIERONSKA, Dorota, Helena Suite 3, 75 Erindale Road Balcatta, Western Australia 6021 / AU | 03 /
MORLEY, Vin, C. Suite 3, 75 Erindale Road Balcatta, Western Australia 6021 / AU | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 02759909.1 | 30.08.2002 | [2004/27] | WO2002AU01190 | Priority number, date | AU2001PP07395 | 31.08.2001 Original published format: AU PP739501 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03019033 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1432925 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/20, F16D65/24, F16D65/78, F16D65/14 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
F16D65/14 (EP,US);
F16D65/78 (KR);
F16D2065/785 (EP,US);
F16D2125/06 (EP,US);
F16D2200/0034 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/27] | F16D65/20, F16D65/24, F16D65/78 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HITZESCHILD FÜR EINEN BREMSKOLBEN UND DIESEN ENTHALTENDE BREMSBETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2004/27] | English: | HEAT SHIELD FOR A BRAKE PISTON AND BRAKE ACTUATOR INCORPORATING SAME | [2004/27] | French: | ECRAN THERMIQUE POUR PISTON DE FREIN, ET RECEPTEUR DE FREINAGE EQUIPE DE CET ECRAN | [2004/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 30.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 21.04.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB909188 (FERDINAND ANTON ERNST PORSCHE) [Y] 2,3,5,6,8,11-14 * page 1, line 37 - line 64; figure . * [A] 1,7; | [A]DE7837265U (KNORR BREMSE) [A] 1,7* the whole document *; | [X]US4248329 (TORIGOE MASAHIKO) [X] 1,2,7-10,15 * column 2, line 3 - line 7; figure 2 *; | [X]GB2086531 (HOOKER CHEMICALS PLASTICS CORP) [X] 1,2,7-11,13,15 * page 1, line 125 - line 130; figures 2,10 *; | [X]US4583623 (RITSEMA IRVING R [US]) [X] 1,4,7,9,15 * column 3, line 1 - line 49; figure - *; | [XY]GB2165902 (DAYTON WALTHER CORP) [X] 1,7,9,10,15 * page 2, line 6 - line 14 * * page 2, line 82 - line 93; figure 5 * [Y] 2,3,5,6,8,11-14; | [A]EP0289399 (BENDIX FRANCE [FR]) [A] 4 * column 5, line 61 - column 7, line 5; figure - * | International search | [X]US4527672 (SCHREINER PETER [US], et al); | [X]US4582180 (LAUTERWASSER ARMIN [DE], et al); | [X]DE3902788 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]); | [X]US4977987 (SCHMIDT HERBERT [DE], et al); | [Y]US5713435 (SCHNEIDER DANIEL P [US], et al) | by applicant | US6146727 |