EP1427301 - PROTECTIVE HOCKEY UNDERGARMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jock Plus Hockey Inc. 51 Main Street Markham North Markham Ontario L3P 1X7 / CA | [2007/24] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states Jock Plus Hockey Inc. 51 Main Street Markham North Markham, Ontario L3P 1X7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REGAN, Paul 81 Colonel Bertram Road Brampton, Ontario L6Z 4T6 / CA | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | van Walstijn, Gerard, et al Nordic Patent Service A/S Højbro Plads 10 1200 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | van Walstijn, Bartholomeus G. G., et al Nordic Patent Service ApS Pilestraede 58 1112 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2004/25] | van Walstijn, Bartholomeus Gerard G. Walstijn Intellectual Property ApS Parkovsvej 3 2820 Gentofte / DK | Application number, filing date | 02759962.0 | 30.08.2002 | [2004/25] | WO2002CA01340 | Priority number, date | CA20012356537 | 04.09.2001 Original published format: CA 2356537 | [2004/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03020061 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1427301 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1427301 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A41B9/08, A63B71/12 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
A41D13/0593 (EP,US);
A41D13/05 (EP,US);
A41D13/0512 (EP,US);
A41D13/08 (EP,US);
A63B71/12 (EP,US);
A41D13/0575 (EP,US);
A63B2208/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/25] | A41B9/08, A63B71/12, // A41D13:05, A41D13:08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZUNTERWÄSCHE FÜR HOCKEYSPIELER | [2004/25] | English: | PROTECTIVE HOCKEY UNDERGARMENT | [2004/25] | French: | SOUS-VETEMENT DE HOCKEY PROTECTEUR | [2004/25] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 11.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.06.2007 | BE | 13.06.2007 | CY | 13.06.2007 | CZ | 13.06.2007 | DK | 13.06.2007 | EE | 13.06.2007 | FI | 13.06.2007 | IT | 13.06.2007 | NL | 13.06.2007 | SK | 13.06.2007 | TR | 13.06.2007 | IE | 30.08.2007 | LU | 30.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | BG | 13.09.2007 | GB | 13.09.2007 | SE | 13.09.2007 | GR | 14.09.2007 | ES | 24.09.2007 | PT | 13.11.2007 | FR | 08.02.2008 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 30.08.2007 | ||
LU | 30.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
GB | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
FR | 08.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 30.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
GB | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
FR | 08.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 30.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
GB | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
FR | 08.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 30.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
GB | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
FR | 08.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/03] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 30.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
GB | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
FR | 08.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 30.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
FR | 08.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
FR | 08.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | SE | 13.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]CA951451 (DELANEY JAMES G) [A] 1-42* the whole document *; | [Y]FR2340063 (LAX LEA [FR]) [Y] 1-41 * page 1, line 6 - line 27 * * page 6, line 7 *; | [A]CH638665 (DELNON RETO [CH]) [A] 1-42 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3409323 (HOLMSTEN CALIN FLORIN) [A] 1-42 * the whole document *; | [DY]CA1290098E (724763 ONTARIO LIMITED [CA]) [DY] 1,2,10-13,18,19,21,28-30,37-40 * the whole document *; | [DY]US6038701 (REGAN PAUL [CA]) [DY] 1,3-9,14-17,21-27,32-36,41 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE20012709U (BURGHARDT GERTRUD [DE]) [Y] 20,31 * figures 3A,3B; claim 1 * | Examination | US3761961 | CA2034621 |