EP1436170 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE TRIGGERING OF PASSIVE RESTRAINT MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/09] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORITZ, Rainer Talstr. 22/1 70794 Filderstadt / DE | 02 /
STUETZLER, Frank-Jürgen 37776 Turnberry Ct. Farmington Hills, MI 48331 / US | [2004/29] | Application number, filing date | 02760125.1 | 21.08.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002DE03050 | Priority number, date | DE2001149118 | 05.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10149118 | [2004/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03031234 | Date: | 17.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1436170 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1436170 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/08] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1436170 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/01 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
B60R21/013 (EP);
B60R21/01512 (EP);
B60R2021/0018 (EP);
B60R2021/0119 (EP);
B60R2021/01306 (EP);
B60R2021/01313 (EP);
B60R21/0134 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2008/09] |
Former [2004/38] | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANSTEUERUNG DER AUSLÖSUNG PASSIVER RÜCKHALTEMITTEL | [2004/29] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE TRIGGERING OF PASSIVE RESTRAINT MEANS | [2004/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DU DECLENCHEMENT DE SYSTEMES DE RETENUE PASSIFS | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 11.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.03.2005
12.01.2006
ADMISSIBLE Conti Temic Microelectronic GmbH Patente & Lizenzen Sieboldstrasse 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.03.2005
Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Abt. Patent & Lizenzen Sieboldstr. 19 90 411 Nürnberg / DE | 19.01.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.03.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.03.2006 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 12.04.2006 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 17.04.2007 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.04.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.05.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.05.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.01.2008 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 23.02.2005 | IT | 23.02.2005 | SE | 23.05.2005 | [2007/39] |
Former [2006/13] | GB | 23.02.2005 | |
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | SE | 23.05.2005 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6023220 (DOBLER GUENTER [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,9-11 * column 1, lines 40-53 * * column 2, line 40 - column 5, line 14; figures 1,4 * [Y] 13,14; | [XY]EP1122136 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,13,14 * paragraph [0055]; claim 19 * [Y] 2-4,9-11; | [Y]DE19822184 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 2-4,9-11,13,14 * column W * | Examination | DE19962491 | DE19722829 | DE19741631 | DE19821163 | DE19961799 | - Merrill I. Skolnik, 'Introduction to radar systems', Mcgraw-Hill Inc, New York 1980, Inhaltsverzeichnisseiten ix, vi-viii, und Seiten 398-401,434- 437, 488-491, 540-543. |