EP1420017 - 1,2-DIHYDRO-2-OXO-1,8-NAPHTHYRIDINE DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd. 6-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [2006/02] |
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states Sumitomo Pharmaceuticals Company, Limited 2-8, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAOKA, Masami 1-10, Mukaigaoka 1-chome Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0053 / JP | 02 /
OHNUMA, Satoshi Room 402, Sumitomo Ph. N. D., 4-15 Maruhashi-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 662-0831 / JP | 03 /
BAN, Hitoshi 9-47-301, Hirota-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 662-0837 / JP | [2004/21] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/21] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02760629.2 | 14.08.2002 | [2004/21] | WO2002JP08266 | Priority number, date | JP20010252673 | 23.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001252673 | [2004/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03018581 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1420017 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/4375, A61P3/06, A61P9/10, A61P43/00 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4375 (EP,US);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 1,2 DIHYDRO 2 OXO 1,8-NAPHTHYRIDINDERIVAT | [2004/21] | English: | 1,2-DIHYDRO-2-OXO-1,8-NAPHTHYRIDINE DERIVATIVE | [2004/21] | French: | DERIVE DE 1,2-DIHYDRO-2-OXO-1,8-NAPHTHYRIDINE | [2004/21] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2004 | Translation filed | 05.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 05.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 05.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/51] | 30.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0842933 (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP]); | [A]EP0947515 (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP]); | [A]EP1086948 (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP]) | International search | [X]EP1104763 (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP]) |