EP1426440 - NOVEL RFRP-3 AND DNA THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [2010/24] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HINUMA, Shuji 7-9-1402, Kasuga 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0821 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Hiromi 1444-23, Oaza Kossho Ishige-machi, Yuki-gun, Ibaraki 300-2741 / JP | 03 /
HABATA, Yugo 17-1-606, Namiki 3-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0044 / JP | 04 /
HOSOYA, Masaki 711-83, Itaya 1-chome Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0007 / JP | 05 /
KITADA, Chieko 2-8, Minamikoyocho 1-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0073 / JP | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Böhm, Brigitte, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | Böhm, Brigitte, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/24] | Lewin, John Harvey Takeda Euro IP Department, 11-12 Charles II Street London SW1Y 4QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02760703.5 | 22.08.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002JP08466 | Priority number, date | JP20010254826 | 24.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001254826 | [2004/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03018795 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1426440 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1426440 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/705, C12N15/12 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/24] | C12N15/09, C07K7/08, C07K14/705, C07K16/28, C12N5/10, C12P21/08, C12Q1/68, A61K38/17, A61K39/395, A61K48/00, G01N33/15, G01N33/50, G01N33/53, G01N33/566, G01N33/577 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUES RFRP-3 UND DNA DAFÜR | [2004/24] | English: | NOVEL RFRP-3 AND DNA THEREOF | [2004/24] | French: | NOUVEAU PEPTIDE RFRP-3 ET ADN DE CELUI-CI | [2004/24] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2004 | Translation filed | 23.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.06.2010 | BE | 16.06.2010 | CY | 16.06.2010 | CZ | 16.06.2010 | DK | 16.06.2010 | EE | 16.06.2010 | FI | 16.06.2010 | IT | 16.06.2010 | NL | 16.06.2010 | SE | 16.06.2010 | SK | 16.06.2010 | TR | 16.06.2010 | IE | 22.08.2010 | LU | 22.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | BG | 16.09.2010 | GR | 17.09.2010 | ES | 27.09.2010 | PT | 18.10.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/42] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
TR | 16.06.2010 | ||
IE | 22.08.2010 | ||
LU | 22.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 16.09.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
TR | 16.06.2010 | ||
IE | 22.08.2010 | ||
LU | 22.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
IE | 22.08.2010 | ||
LU | 22.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
IE | 22.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
IE | 22.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
SE | 16.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP1132405 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-35,43-50 * see the whole document, especially page 9, lines 1 to 9 *; | [PX]CA2401946 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-35,43-50* see the whole document * | International search | [X]WO0029441 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al); | [A] - HINUMA S. ET AL., "New neuropeptides containing carboxy-terminal RFamide and their receptor in mammals", NATURE CELL BIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 2, pages 703 - 708, XP002942274 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35036326 |