EP1444178 - SLURRY HYDROCARBON SYNTHESIS WITH ISOMERIZATION ZONE IN EXTERNAL LIFT REACTOR LOOP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Annandale NJ 08801-0900 / US | ||
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East, P.O. Box 900 Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MART, Charles, John 14044 Eagle Chase Circle Chantilly Virginia 20151 / US | 02 /
WITTENBRINK, Robert, Jay 6018 Riverchase Trail Kingwood, TX 77345 / US | 03 /
CLARK, Janet, Renee 10324 springdale Baton Rouge, LA 70810 / US | 04 /
FEELEY, Jennifer, Schaefer 59 Old Mountain Road Lebanon, NJ 08833 / US | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | Troch, Geneviève, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | Troch, Geneviève, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc., P.O. Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 02761839.6 | 27.09.2002 | [2004/33] | WO2002US30741 | Priority number, date | US20010992390 | 06.11.2001 Original published format: US 992390 | [2004/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03040069 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1444178 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1444178 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07C1/00 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
C10G2/342 (EP,US);
B01J19/2485 (EP,US);
B01J8/006 (EP,US);
B01J8/226 (EP,US);
B01J8/228 (EP,US);
C10G45/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUSPENSIONSVERFAHREN FÜR DIE KOHLENWASSERSTOFFSYNTHESE MIT EINER ISOMERIERUNGSZONE IN EINEM EXTERNEN AUFWÄRTSSTROM SCHLEIFENREAKTOR | [2004/33] | English: | SLURRY HYDROCARBON SYNTHESIS WITH ISOMERIZATION ZONE IN EXTERNAL LIFT REACTOR LOOP | [2004/33] | French: | SYNTHESE D'HYDROCARBURES EN SUSPENSION A ZONE D'ISOMERISATION DANS UNE BOUCLE DE REACTEUR A SUSTENTATION EXTERNE | [2004/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 03.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 15.06.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.08.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.02.2010 | BE | 24.02.2010 | CY | 24.02.2010 | CZ | 24.02.2010 | EE | 24.02.2010 | FI | 24.02.2010 | SK | 24.02.2010 | TR | 24.02.2010 | BG | 24.05.2010 | GR | 25.05.2010 | PT | 25.06.2010 | IE | 27.09.2010 | LU | 27.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
IE | 27.09.2010 | ||
LU | 27.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
IE | 27.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | PT | 25.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4423265 (CHU YUNG-FENG [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 18; figure 1; claims 1,7 *; | [A]US5306860 (BIGEARD PIERRE-HENRI [FR], et al) [A] 1-25 * claim 1 *; | [DA]US5382748 (BEHRMANN WILLIAM C [US], et al) [DA] 1-25 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [DA]US5811468 (CHANG MIN [US], et al) [DA] 1-25 * column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 16 * * column 9, line 26 - line 51; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5811469 (LEVINESS STEPHEN C [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]US5958986 (MART CHARLES JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * column 8, line 44 - column 9, line 2; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1142980 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-25* figure 1; claim 1 * | by applicant | GB2322633 | - CRYNES ET AL., "Monolithic Froth Reactor: Development of a novel three-Phase Catalytic System", AICHE J, (199502), vol. 41, no. 2, pages 337 - 345 |